This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 02:26:18 (UTC).

CADLES OF WEST VIRGINA, LLC VS KOBY INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/26/2018 CADLES OF WEST VIRGINA, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KOBY INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9491

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CADLES OF WEST VIRGINA LLC

Defendants

KOBY INTERNATIONAL INC.

BACHAR JAKOV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAYYAR ASSLY

Defendant Attorneys

NOBLE LAWRENCE C.

BLUM HOWARD SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

7/26/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

7/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ASSLY SAYYAR, ESQ. RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

1/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ASSLY SAYYAR, ESQ. RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/07/2021

1/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/07/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/10/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Settlement

8/31/2020: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Ruling

9/3/2020: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

8/4/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/27/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/9/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ASSLY SAYYAR, ESQ. RE MATERIAL BREACH OF SETTLEMENT

6/12/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ASSLY SAYYAR, ESQ. RE MATERIAL BREACH OF SETTLEMENT

Substitution of Attorney

6/24/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Settlement

4/23/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

4/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/28/2020

4/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/28/2020

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: CADLES OF WEST VIRGINA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CADLES OF WEST VIRGINA, LLC on 06/26/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by CADLES OF WEST VIRGINA, LLC as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/08/2021 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 07/20/2021 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 01/07/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Assly Sayyar, Esq. Re Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Filed by: CADLES OF WEST VIRGINA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/07/2020 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/05/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: CADLES OF WEST VIRGINA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/24/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 02/14/2019 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: CADLES OF WEST VIRGINA, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JAKOV BACHAR (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: CADLES OF WEST VIRGINA, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KOBY INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketDocument:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketDocument:Notice Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketDocument:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Other Promissory Note/Collections

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCalendaring:Conference-Case Management 12/24/18 at 8:30 am Mitchell L. Beckloff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less