Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2021 at 01:08:23 (UTC).

CABRERA, ROCIO ANABEL VS CABRERA, DAVID G.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 CABRERA, ROCIO ANABEL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CABRERA, DAVID G. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0483

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CABRERA ROCIO ANABEL

Respondent

CABRERA DAVID G.

 

Court Documents

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

3/29/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Declaration - UCCJEA

3/29/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

3/29/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

3/29/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

3/29/2021: Summons

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

3/29/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4/1/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

4/1/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less