This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 18:30:59 (UTC).

CABRERA CONTRERAS, MA CONSUELO VS CABRERA SEPULVEDA, JULIAN

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 CABRERA CONTRERAS, MA CONSUELO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CABRERA SEPULVEDA, JULIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1596

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CABRERA CONTRERAS MA CONSUELO

Respondent

CABRERA SEPULVEDA JULIAN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons - Served 11/27/2020

12/2/2020: Proof of Service of Summons - Served 11/27/2020

Proof of Service of Summons - Served 11/27/2020

12/2/2020: Proof of Service of Summons - Served 11/27/2020

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

11/25/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Declaration - UCCJEA

11/25/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

11/25/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

11/25/2020: Summons

Declaration - Income and Expense

11/25/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

Notice - Case Assignment

11/25/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

11/25/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Served 11/27/2020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less