This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2022 at 05:30:56 (UTC).

CA-TRECE MASSEY VS SELENE FINANCE, LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 CA-TRECE MASSEY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SELENE FINANCE, LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0548

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MASSEY CA-TRECE

Defendants

SELENE FINANCE LP

U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR RCF 2 ACQUISITION TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARA ANTHONY P.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/6/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/6/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/5/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/5/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Declaration - VERIFICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/5/2022: Declaration - VERIFICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Complaint

7/5/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/5/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • Hearing03/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • Hearing12/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CA-TRECE MASSEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketVERIFICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Filed by CA-TRECE MASSEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CA-TRECE MASSEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CA-TRECE MASSEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SELENE FINANCE, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARA ANTHONY P.