This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2019 at 01:03:54 (UTC).

CA ANI BANKS VS SOGO GLOBAL INVESTMENT INC

Case Summary

On 03/01/2018 a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle case was filed by CA ANI BANKS against SOGO GLOBAL INVESTMENT INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6629

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Respondents and Defendants

SOGO GLOBAL INVESTMENT INC

DOES 1 TO 12

Guardian Ad Litem

ROSS SHAKIYA

Minor

BANKS CA'ANI

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

5/9/2018: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

STIPULATION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES FROM COMPLAINT;

5/14/2018: STIPULATION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES FROM COMPLAINT;

Proof of Service by Mail

7/5/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

7/5/2019: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Minute Order

7/9/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Settlement

7/9/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for

7/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

4/16/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

4/16/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. NEGLIGENCE ? PREMISES LIABILITY ;ETC

3/1/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. NEGLIGENCE ? PREMISES LIABILITY ;ETC

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • at 2:26 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Ca'ani Banks (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement) of 07/09/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Ca'ani Banks (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim; Filed by Ca'ani Banks (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by Sogo Global Investment, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • STIPULATION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES FROM COMPLAINT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Sogo Global Investment, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Shakiya Ross (Legacy Party); Ca'ani Banks (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. NEGLIGENCE PREMISES LIABILITY ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC696629    Hearing Date: January 10, 2020    Dept: 4A

Petition to Approve Minor’s Compromise

Having considered the petitioning papers, the Court rules as follows.  No opposing papers were filed.

BACKGROUND

On March 1, 2018, Plaintiff Ca’Ani Banks, by and through her guardian ad litem Shakiya Ross, filed a complaint against Defendant SOGO Global Investment, Inc. alleging negligence, premises liability, and negligence per se fir a slip-and-fall that occurred on May 8, 2015.

On November 15, 2019, Petitioner Shakiya Ross filed a petition to approve a compromise of disputed claim for Plaintiff Ca’Ani Banks.

On November 26, 2019, Petitioner Shakiya Ross filed another petition to approve a compromise of disputed claim for Plaintiff Ca’Ani Banks.

An Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (conditional) is set for January 28, 2020.

PARTY’S REQUEST

Petitioner Shakiya Ross (“Petitioner”) requests that the Court grant a petition to approve a compromise of disputed claim for Plaintiff Ca’Ani Banks (“Claimant”).

LEGAL STANDARD

Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952(a), Petitioner and Claimant are required to attend the hearing on the petition.  However, the Court finds their attendance is not requires due to the amount of the settlement and Claimant’s age.

DISCUSSION

Petitioner filed petitions to approve a compromise of disputed claim for Plaintiff Ca’Ani Banks on both November 15, 2019 and November 26, 2019.  The Court consider the November 26, 2019 petition because it is more recently filed.

The Court finds the petition is properly approved.  Defendant it to pay Claimant a gross settlement of $40,000 for fractures to Claimant’s second and third metatarsals in her left foot from a slip-and-fall.  Claimant’s only persisting injury is a gait abnormality that was present before the slip-and-fall.  Petitioner is unclear as to what extent Plaintiff’s pain in her left foot relates to the gait abnormality.  Nevertheless, its impact on Plaintiff’s daily life is relatively minor.  As such, the Court finds this settlement to be fair and reasonable.

Portions of the gross settlement is to be allocated for medical expenses, attorney’s fees, and costs.  $1,386.96 of the gross settlement is to pay for medical expenses.  These medical expenses consist of $600 to Allen Massihi, Podiatric Inc. and $796.96 to the Department of Health Care Services.

The net settlement of $24,953.04 is to be deposited in an insured account at Bank of America, 1399 Foothill Boulevard, La Verne, California 91750.  These funds are may be withdrawn only upon the authorization of the Court.

The petition filed on November 26, 2019 is GRANTED.

The Court shall approve the proposed order approving this petition and the proposed order to deposit funds into a blocked account concurrently filed with the petition on November 26, 2019.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice of this ruling.