This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 06:49:31 (UTC).

C W DRIVER INC VS 18131 VENTURA BOULEVARD LLC

Case Summary

On 03/24/2017 C W DRIVER INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 18131 VENTURA BOULEVARD LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MEL RED RECANA and ALAN S. ROSENFIELD. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3335

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MEL RED RECANA

ALAN S. ROSENFIELD

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

C.W. DRIVER INC

C.W. DRIVER INC.

C. W. DRIVER INC.

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 TO 50

18131 VENTURA BLVD. LLC

VENTANA MEDICAL CENTER LP - DOE 11

18131 VENTURA BOULEVARD LLC

Respondent, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

18131 VENTURA BLVD. LLC

Cross Defendants

JD REINFORCING INC.

LEGENDARY STRUCTURES INC.

C.W. DRIVER INC.

LAND MARK ELECTRIC INC.

PERI FORM WORK SYSTEMS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

GROPMAN TED R. ESQ.

PEPPER HAMILTON LLP

GROPMAN TED ROBERT

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LYNBERG & WATKINS APC

SHUMENER ODSON & OH LLP

LONG MICHAEL A.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LONG MICHAEL A.

Other Attorneys

LARIN MICHAEL JAY

OH HENRY HUI-SOO

LONG MICHAEL A

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; AND 2. FORECLOSURE OF MECHANIC'S LIEN

3/24/2017: COMPLAINT: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; AND 2. FORECLOSURE OF MECHANIC'S LIEN

SUMMONS

3/24/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/7/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

4/7/2017: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Unknown

4/25/2017: Unknown

Unknown

5/11/2017: Unknown

Unknown

5/16/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF ADVANCE JURY FEES BY DEFENDANT

5/16/2017: NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF ADVANCE JURY FEES BY DEFENDANT

Minute Order

5/18/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF (1) CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND (2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/19/2017: NOTICE OF (1) CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND (2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

18131 VENTURA BLVD, LLC'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT FILED BY C.W. DRIVER, INC.

5/22/2017: 18131 VENTURA BLVD, LLC'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT FILED BY C.W. DRIVER, INC.

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF 18131 VENTURA BLVD, LLC FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT (PRIME CONTRACT); ETC

5/22/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF 18131 VENTURA BLVD, LLC FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT (PRIME CONTRACT); ETC

Unknown

5/22/2017: Unknown

DECLARATION OF TED R. GROPMAN RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/23/2017: DECLARATION OF TED R. GROPMAN RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

5/23/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

5/24/2017: Unknown

Unknown

5/31/2017: Unknown

ANSWER BY C.W. DRIVER, INC. TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF 18131 VENTURA BLVD, LLC

6/5/2017: ANSWER BY C.W. DRIVER, INC. TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF 18131 VENTURA BLVD, LLC

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2018
  • Notice; Filed by C.W. Driver, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Answer; Filed by LEGENDARY STRUCTURES, INC. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • ANSWER OF DEFENDANT LEGENDARY STRUCTURES INC. TO 18131 VENTURA BLVD, LLC S UNVERIFIED COMPLAUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • at 08:32 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-08-10 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-08-03 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 45; Court Order (Court Order; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-07-25 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by 18131 Ventura Blvd. LLC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by C.W. Driver, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by C.W. Driver, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • COMPLAINT: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; AND 2. FORECLOSURE OF MECHANIC'S LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Peri Formwork Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where 18131 VENTURA BLVD. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LAND MARK ELECTRIC INC. is a litigant