This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 20:52:03 (UTC).

BYRON WINSTON VS AMCORD, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 BYRON WINSTON filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AMCORD, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7975

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Defendants

AMCORD INC.

BALDWIN HILLS BUILDING MATERIAL CO.

CALPORTLAND COMPANY FKA CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANY

CONTRACTORS BUILDING MATERIALS INC.

FRONTIER BUILDING SUPPLY CO.

HANSON PERMANENT CEMENT INC. FKA KAISER CEMENT CORPORATION

HIGHLAND STUCCO AND LIME PRODUCTS INC.

INGLEWOOD BUILDING MATERIALS

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY INC.

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC.

LEHIGH SOUTHWEST CEMENT COMPANY

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

MISSION STUCCO CO.

PAREX USA INC. FKA PAREXLAHABRA INC. FKA LA HABRA PRODUCTS INC.

SAM GORDON ENTERPRISES INC.

SOCO WEST INC.

THOMPSON BUILDING MATERIALS INC.

WEST JEFFERSON BUILDING MATERIALS INC.

WESTERN BLENDED PRODUCTS

WESTSIDE BUILDING MATERIAL CORPORATION

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BERKES ROBERT HARVEY

ASPERICUETA ERIKA ROSE

PRINDLE KENNETH BRUCE

AMEELE MELANIE LEIGH

HUIE JEREMY D.

POND FRANCIS D.

Other Attorneys

BRAYTON ALAN RICHARD

WILLIAMS NANCY T.

 

Court Documents

Answer

9/13/2021: Answer

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT BALDWIN HILLS BUILDING MATERIAL CO BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE

8/30/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT BALDWIN HILLS BUILDING MATERIAL CO BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MONTIE DERBY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

8/30/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MONTIE DERBY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT SAM GORDON ENTERPRISES INC. BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE

8/30/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT SAM GORDON ENTERPRISES INC. BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CLAUDIO LUCIO RE NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

8/30/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CLAUDIO LUCIO RE NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MONTIE DERBY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

8/30/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MONTIE DERBY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CLAUDIO LUCIO RE NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

8/30/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CLAUDIO LUCIO RE NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

8/30/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING

9/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF, FOR O...)

9/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF, FOR O...)

Answer

9/8/2021: Answer

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF BALDWIN HILLS BUILDING MATERIAL CO. (ENTITY NO. C0211028), BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE

9/8/2021: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF BALDWIN HILLS BUILDING MATERIAL CO. (ENTITY NO. C0211028), BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF SAM GORDON ENTERPRISES INC., ENTITY NO. C0224425, BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE

9/8/2021: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF SAM GORDON ENTERPRISES INC., ENTITY NO. C0224425, BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT BALDWIN HILLS BUILDING MATERIAL CO., BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE

9/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT BALDWIN HILLS BUILDING MATERIAL CO., BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT SAM GORDON ENTERPRISES INC., ENTITY NO C0224425, BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE

9/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT SAM GORDON ENTERPRISES INC., ENTITY NO C0224425, BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/31/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/31/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/31/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Thompson Building Materials, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Amcord, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDefendant Thompson Building Materials, Inc.'s Demand for Jury Trial and Estimate of Length of Trial; Filed by Thompson Building Materials, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lehigh Southwest Cement Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (on Behalf of Plaintiff, for Order Authorizing Service of Summons on Defendant Sam Gordon Enterprises Inc..(Entity No. C0224425) by Delivery of Process to Secretary of State (Winston-21STCV27975)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (on Behalf of Plaintiff, for Order Authorizing Service of Summons on Defendant Baldwin Hills Building Material Co.(Entity No. C0211028) by Delivery of Process to Secretary of State (Winston-21STCV27975)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOrder (Authorizing Service of Baldwin Hills Building Material Co. (Entity No. C0211028), By Delivery of Process to Secretary of State); Filed by Byron Winston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application on Behalf of Plaintiff, for O...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer (Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Personal Injury); Filed by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOrder (Authorizing Service of Sam Gordon Enterprises Inc., Entity No. C0224425, By Delivery of Process to Secretary of State); Filed by Byron Winston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Order Authorizing Service of Summons on Defendant Sam Gordon Enterprises Inc. by Delivery of Process to Secretary of State); Filed by Byron Winston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Order Authorizing Service of Summons on Defendant Baldwin Hills Building Material Co by Delivery of Process to Secretary of State); Filed by Byron Winston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Montie Derby in Support of Ex Parte Application); Filed by Byron Winston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDefendant CalPortland Company's (FKA California Portland Cement Company) Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Personal Injuries- Asbestos; Filed by Calportland Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/09/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Byron Winston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Byron Winston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTRACTOR MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SAM GORDON ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTERN BLENDED PRODUCTS is a litigant