This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2022 at 04:43:42 (UTC).

BYRON MERLOS VS CLEVELAND RECLAIM INDUSTRIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 BYRON MERLOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CLEVELAND RECLAIM INDUSTRIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7334

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERLOS BYRON

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF SANTA MONICA

CLEVELAND RECLAIM INDUSTRIES INC. DBA TURTLE PLASTICS

HERC RENTALS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LALLANDE M. LAWRENCE SR.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CHUNG ALICE H

LEWIS ROSEMARIE SUAZO

SNYDER BRADLEY A

BIANCO ERICA

Other Attorneys

NGUYEN MINH

 

Court Documents

Answer

4/21/2022: Answer

Notice of Change of Firm Name

4/26/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Continuance

4/26/2022: Notice of Continuance

Answer

4/26/2022: Answer

Association of Attorney

8/12/2021: Association of Attorney

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

8/13/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/1/2021: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

10/27/2021: Answer

Answer

11/4/2021: Answer

Answer

11/4/2021: Answer

Answer

11/4/2021: Answer

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/4/2022: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/8/2022: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/24/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/3/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

6/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/8/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Cross-Complaint

5/17/2021: Cross-Complaint

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2024
  • Hearing02/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • Hearing03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • Hearing02/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Cleveland Reclaim Industries, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cleveland Reclaim Industries, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by Byron Merlos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Santa Monica (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Cleveland Reclaim Industries, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketOrder ([Proposed] Order Allowing Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint); Filed by Byron Merlos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (Stipulation Allowing Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint); Filed by Byron Merlos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Cleveland Reclaim Industries, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Santa Monica (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Byron Merlos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Email Address for Electronic Service); Filed by Byron Merlos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Byron Merlos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Byron Merlos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Byron Merlos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Herc Rentals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF SANTA MONICA is a litigant