This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/11/2021 at 11:35:08 (UTC).

BWAYNE EUNICE ROBERTS VS STACIE BARAGIOLA

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 BWAYNE EUNICE ROBERTS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STACIE BARAGIOLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0745

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTS BWAYNE EUNICE

Defendant

BARAGIOLA STACIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANG HAZEL

Defendant Attorney

FILIAN ARI J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/8/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/2/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

4/27/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/27/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

4/27/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Dismissal

11/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Bwayne Eunice Roberts (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Stacie Baragiola (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Stacie Baragiola (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Stacie Baragiola (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Bwayne Eunice Roberts (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bwayne Eunice Roberts (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bwayne Eunice Roberts (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bwayne Eunice Roberts (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bwayne Eunice Roberts (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FILIAN ARI J.