This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 04:58:19 (UTC).

BUSINESS BROKERS TECHNOLOGIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BIZEX VS RAAM ENTERPRISES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 BUSINESS BROKERS TECHNOLOGIES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BIZEX filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAAM ENTERPRISES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0642

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUSINESS BROKERS TECHNOLOGIES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BIZEX

Defendants

AMMARI RAKANN

RAAM ENTERPRISES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IEZZA NICK

Defendant Attorney

EVANS NEIL C.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

3/7/2023: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/23/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

12/20/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/1/2022: Case Management Statement

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

11/7/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RACHAEL C. PARENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

8/4/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RACHAEL C. PARENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

Substitution of Attorney

8/5/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

8/5/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (CCP 484.040); ...)

8/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (CCP 484.040); ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT HEARING

7/29/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT HEARING

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

7/29/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

7/29/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON RE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

8/1/2022: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON RE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

8/1/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RAKANN AMMARI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT RE APPLICA

8/1/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RAKANN AMMARI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT RE APPLICA

Proof of Personal Service

5/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • Hearing03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Business Brokers Technologies, Inc., a California corporation dba BizEx (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Business Brokers Technologies, Inc., a California corporation dba BizEx (Plaintiff); As to: Raam Enterprises, a California corporation (Defendant); Rakann Ammari (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to Raam Enterprises, a California corporation; Rakann Ammari; On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Business Brokers Technologies, Inc., a California corporation dba BizEx on 11/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Business Brokers Technologies, Inc., a California corporation dba BizEx (Plaintiff); As to: Raam Enterprises, a California corporation (Defendant); Rakann Ammari (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/21/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Business Brokers Technologies, Inc., a California corporation dba BizEx (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketHearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040) scheduled for 08/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketHearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040) scheduled for 08/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040); Filed by: Business Brokers Technologies, Inc., a California corporation dba BizEx (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040); Filed by: Business Brokers Technologies, Inc., a California corporation dba BizEx (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Business Brokers Technologies, Inc., a California corporation dba BizEx (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketApplication for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc. Filed by: Business Brokers Technologies, Inc., a California corporation dba BizEx (Plaintiff); As to: Rakann Ammari (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Applications for Writ of Attachment; Filed by: Business Brokers Technologies, Inc., a California corporation dba BizEx (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketApplication for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc. Filed by: Business Brokers Technologies, Inc., a California corporation dba BizEx (Plaintiff); As to: Raam Enterprises, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Business Brokers Technologies, Inc., a California corporation dba BizEx (Plaintiff); As to: Raam Enterprises, a California corporation (Defendant); Rakann Ammari (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less