This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 23:48:02 (UTC).

BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC VS ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3590

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURTON WAY HOTELS LLC

Defendants

ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY

ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S CONSORITUM NO. 9226

CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

EVEREST INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

GENERAL STAR INDEMNITY COMPANY

HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

INTERSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY

IRONSHORE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

LLOYD'S UNDERWRITER SYNDICATE NO. 0033 HIS

LLOYD'S UNDERWRITER SYNDICATE NO. 1274 AUL

LLOYD'S UNDERWRITER SYNDICATE NO. 1919

LLOYD'S UNDERWRITER SYNDICATE NO. 2488 CGM

LLOYD'S UNDERWRITER SYNDICATE NO. 3268 AGR

LLOYD'S UNDERWRITER SYNDICATE NO. 4444

LLOYD'S UNDERWRITER SYNDICATE NO. 9536

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PASICH KIRK

 

Court Documents

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/12/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/12/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Proof of Service by Mail

10/14/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/15/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/7/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/7/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/7/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/7/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/7/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/7/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/7/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/7/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/7/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/7/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/7/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/7/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/7/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • Hearing11/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (Of Service); Filed by BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (Of Service); Filed by BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit of Service); Filed by BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit of Service); Filed by BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit of Service); Filed by BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit of Service); Filed by BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit of Service); Filed by BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit of Service); Filed by BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit of Service); Filed by BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit of Service); Filed by BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit of Service); Filed by BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BURTON WAY HOTELS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where BURTON WAY HOTELS LTD A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY A MISSOURI CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL STAR INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant