This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 00:35:19 (UTC).

BURLINGTON CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL VS CUMMINGS, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 07/12/2018 BURLINGTON CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against CUMMINGS, ROBERT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DOTSON, KIMBERLY and LERNER, MARC O. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4923

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DOTSON, KIMBERLY

LERNER, MARC O

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BURLINGTON CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL

Respondent

CUMMINGS ROBERT

Other

KATZ MARC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KATZ MARC STEVEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 6, Lerner, Marc O, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 6, Dotson, Kimberly, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 6, Dotson, Kimberly, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Petition - Workplace Violence; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURLINGTON CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATZ MARC STEVEN