This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 08:59:46 (UTC).

BULLOCK, JODIE VS ANDERSON, NICOLE

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 BULLOCK, JODIE filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against ANDERSON, NICOLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SPEAR, EMILY T. and WARREN, JEANMARIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3951

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SPEAR, EMILY T.

WARREN, JEANMARIE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BULLOCK JODIE

Claimant

CAIRE JACQUELINE

Respondent

ANDERSON NICOLE

Not Classified By Court

ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC

A.S.O.S.D. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TAMER STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - Filed With Proof of Service

12/29/2020: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - Filed With Proof of Service

Ex Parte - Application

1/6/2021: Ex Parte - Application

Minute Order

1/6/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service

1/7/2021: Proof of Service

Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal

6/3/2021: Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - NOA 11/16/20 B309230 Fail to File Designation/Election; Fail to Pay: REPORTER TRANSCRIPT FEES AND DEPOSIT

12/14/2020: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - NOA 11/16/20 B309230 Fail to File Designation/Election; Fail to Pay: REPORTER TRANSCRIPT FEES AND DEPOSIT

OSC - Re Contempt

11/13/2020: OSC - Re Contempt

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - General Appeal

11/16/2020: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - General Appeal

Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

11/23/2020: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

Minute Order

9/15/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

8/20/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Proof of Service - Notice of Hearing, Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order,

8/20/2020: Proof of Service - Notice of Hearing, Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order,

Proof of Service - Notice of Hearing, Request for Civil Restraining Order

8/20/2020: Proof of Service - Notice of Hearing, Request for Civil Restraining Order

Minute Order

8/20/2020: Minute Order

Petition - Civil Harassment

7/29/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003

7/29/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

7/29/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • Hearing07/07/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 13 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause re: Contempt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (NOA 11-16-20, B309230 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketRefund Approved (Unused Transcript); Filed by Depositor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketRefund Approved (Court Reporter Transcript); Filed by Claimant Reporter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketRefund Initiated (Unused Transcript); Filed by Depositor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketRefund Initiated (Court Reporter Transcript); Filed by Claimant Reporter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketAffidavit for Rlse Funds/Req for Payment Rptr Appeal Trnscpt (NOA 11/16/20 COURT REPORTER: JACQUELINE CAIRE )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit (NOA 11/16/20 APPROVED 4/22/21 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (Initial; )

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 13, Spear, Emily T., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (Notice of Hearing, Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order, ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (Notice of Hearing, Request for Civil Restraining Order ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAMER STEVEN