This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2023 at 20:28:33 (UTC).

BUKHARIAN JEWISH CONGRESS OF ARIZONA, AN ARIZONA NONPROFIT CORPORATION VS REVITAL ZADIKOV, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2023 BUKHARIAN JEWISH CONGRESS OF ARIZONA, AN ARIZONA NONPROFIT CORPORATION filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against REVITAL ZADIKOV,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1154

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUKHARIAN JEWISH CONGRESS OF ARIZONA

Defendants

DANIEL ROMAN TRUSTEE OF THE ROMAN FAMILY TRUST

DEBRA A. ABRAMSON TRUSTEE OF THE DEBRA A. ABRAMSON 2012 GIFT TRUST U/A

EARL B. ABRAMSON TRUSTEE OF THE EARL B. ABRAMSON 1998 TRUST

FBO JOSEPH M. DAVIS TRADITIONAL IRA A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

JANICE L. PIRAINO AND JOHN K. PIRAINO TRUSTEES OF THE PIRAINO FAMILY TRUST

JAY M. REFOLD AND DEBRA L. REFOLD CO-TRUSTEES OF THE REFOLD FAMILY TRUST

JOEL A. STONE TRUSTEE OF THE BARBARA A STONE IRREVOCABLE TRUST

MARK GARBER TRUSTEE OF THE MARK GARBER TRUST

NEAL COHEN TRUSTEE OF THE NEAL I. COHEN REVOCABLE TRUST

PROVIDENT TRUST GROUP LLC

ZADIKOV NISAN

ZADIKOV REVITAL

ASHWOOD TD SERVICES LLC

CAPITAL ALLIANCE LLC

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

TREADWELL JAMES H.

MOFFITT CHRISTOPHER M.

 

Court Documents

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

9/11/2023: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Notice of Continuance

8/31/2023: Notice of Continuance

Notice of Continuance

8/29/2023: Notice of Continuance

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/25/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/25/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/25/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Ruling

8/22/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

8/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Request for Judicial Notice

8/8/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

8/8/2023: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

7/12/2023: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/12/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

7/12/2023: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND STATUS CONFERENCE RE: PROOFS OF SERVICE

6/12/2023: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND STATUS CONFERENCE RE: PROOFS OF SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE ON REMAINING UNSERVED ...)

5/31/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE ON REMAINING UNSERVED ...)

Notice of Ruling

5/26/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: RESOLUTION ...)

5/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: RESOLUTION ...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ODER EXPUNGING NOTICES OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

5/8/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ODER EXPUNGING NOTICES OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/27/2023

Hearing09/27/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

Hearing09/27/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

Hearing09/27/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

Hearing09/27/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Corporate Representation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: Capital Alliance, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketNotice of Plaintiff's Failure to Serve Opposition to Defendant Capital Alliance's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: Capital Alliance, LLC (Defendant); As to: BUKHARIAN JEWISH CONGRESS OF ARIZONA (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: BUKHARIAN JEWISH CONGRESS OF ARIZONA (Plaintiff); As to: REVITAL ZADIKOV (Defendant); NISAN ZADIKOV (Defendant); WHOLESALEZON LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings scheduled for 09/18/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 09/27/2023 09:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
92 More Docket Entries
01/19/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maureen Duffy-Lewis in Department 38 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BUKHARIAN JEWISH CONGRESS OF ARIZONA, an Arizona nonprofit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: REVITAL ZADIKOV (Defendant); NISAN ZADIKOV (Defendant); WHOLESALEZON LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: BUKHARIAN JEWISH CONGRESS OF ARIZONA, an Arizona nonprofit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: REVITAL ZADIKOV (Defendant); NISAN ZADIKOV (Defendant); WHOLESALEZON LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BUKHARIAN JEWISH CONGRESS OF ARIZONA, an Arizona nonprofit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: REVITAL ZADIKOV (Defendant); NISAN ZADIKOV (Defendant); WHOLESALEZON LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less