This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2023 at 03:23:50 (UTC).

BUENA VENTURA POST ACUTE CARE CENTER VS MURILLO, ROBERTO

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 BUENA VENTURA POST ACUTE CARE CENTER filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against MURILLO, ROBERTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are NEAL, REGINALD and COHEN, LAURA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4291

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

NEAL, REGINALD

COHEN, LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BUENA VENTURA POST ACUTE CARE CENTER

Respondent

MURILLO ROBERTO

Other

ACOSTA LETICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BERKE JEFF

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

9/29/2021: Minute Order

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

9/29/2021: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Minute Order

9/3/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

9/3/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

9/3/2021: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Proof of Service

9/3/2021: Proof of Service

Miscellaneous - Statement of Victor Tejeda

9/2/2021: Miscellaneous - Statement of Victor Tejeda

Response - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

8/30/2021: Response - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

Proof of Service - Mail - WV-250

8/30/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - WV-250

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

8/13/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

8/13/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

8/13/2021: Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 94, Neal, Reginald, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO After Evidence by both

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 94, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Statement of Victor Tejeda ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketResponse - Workplace Violence (non-violence); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (WV-250 ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence (non-violence); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less