This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2022 at 02:27:11 (UTC).

BUDGET BLINDS, LLC VS DAVID H. CARRILLO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 BUDGET BLINDS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAVID H CARRILLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0778

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUDGET BLINDS LLC

Defendants

CARRILLO DAVID H. DBA BUDGET BLINDS OF GLENDORA

CARRILLO JESSICA AKA JESSICA LOBAINA DBA BUDGET BLINDS OF GLENDORA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MINASSIAN NATALIA

MINASSIAN NATALIA A.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/27/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/27/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/27/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/27/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/26/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/22/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

8/22/2022: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/22/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY STATEMENT

8/22/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY STATEMENT

Default Judgment

9/7/2022: Default Judgment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Budget Blinds, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (- Plaintiffs Evidentiary Statement); Filed by Budget Blinds, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Budget Blinds, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Partial, without prejudice); Filed by Budget Blinds, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (- DEFAULT ENTERED); Filed by Budget Blinds, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Budget Blinds, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Budget Blinds, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Budget Blinds, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint (For Money); Filed by Budget Blinds, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Budget Blinds LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MINASSIAN NATALIA