Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2020 at 08:05:12 (UTC).

BT2 LANEWOOD, LLC., A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS SERRANITO, LLC., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 BT2 LANEWOOD, LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SERRANITO, LLC , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2877

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BT2 LANEWOOD LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

606 N WESTERN OWNER LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SERRANITO LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAKARIAIE JACK M.

Defendant Attorney

PAULY ANDREW STUART

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

7/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY OF ACTION

7/28/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY OF ACTION

Case Management Statement

7/23/2020: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTY M MORCOMB IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

7/13/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTY M MORCOMB IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

6/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION) OF 06/16/2020

6/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION) OF 06/16/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

4/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW S. PAULY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/15/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW S. PAULY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ZACHARY M. LASRY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/15/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ZACHARY M. LASRY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/7/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/7/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/1/2020: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2020
  • Docketat 11:58 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/28/2020, Stipulation for Binding Arbitration); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BT2 Lanewood, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (For Binding Arbitration and Stay of Action); Filed by BT2 Lanewood, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Serranito, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); 606 N Western Owner, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Of Christy M Morcomb In Support Of Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Action); Filed by Serranito, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); 606 N Western Owner, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docketat 11:26 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Setting Motion to Compel Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Zachary M. Lasry in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Serranito, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); 606 N Western Owner, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Andrew S. Pauly in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Serranito, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); 606 N Western Owner, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BT2 Lanewood, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BT2 Lanewood, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BT2 Lanewood, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BT2 Lanewood, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BT2 Lanewood, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZAKARIAIE JACK M.