This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2021 at 20:44:19 (UTC).

BRYCEN BRADFIELD VS CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 BRYCEN BRADFIELD filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0547

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRADFIELD BRYCEN

Respondent

CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KOZICH S. DAVID

Respondent Attorneys

YAMSHON ELLEN RUTH

GOMEZ RYAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

6/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

3/30/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

3/30/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/01/2021

4/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/01/2021

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/4/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

3/26/2021: Answer

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

3/30/2021: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

2/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/24/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER, BRYCEN BRADFIELD, TO REST...)

2/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER, BRYCEN BRADFIELD, TO REST...)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition - PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

2/22/2021: Petition - PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

2/22/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/22/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

2/22/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX-PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER/PLAINTIFF BRYCEN BRADFIELD TO RESTRAIN THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE FROM ENFORCING ITS ORDERS TO REVOKE BRADFIELDS

2/23/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX-PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER/PLAINTIFF BRYCEN BRADFIELD TO RESTRAIN THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE FROM ENFORCING ITS ORDERS TO REVOKE BRADFIELDS

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • Hearing05/06/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 86 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 82; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 82; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER) of 04/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD); Filed by Brycen Bradfield (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketOpposition (OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE); Filed by Brycen Bradfield (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 82; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (TO RESTRAIN THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE FROM ENFORCING ITS ORDERS TO REVOKE BRADFIELD?S APPOINTMENT AND COMMISSION AS A NOTARY PUBLIC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (EX-PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER/PLAINTIFF BRYCEN BRADFIELD TO RESTRAIN THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE FROM ENFORCING ITS ORDERS TO REVOKE BRADFIELD?S APPOINTMENT AND COMMISSION AS A NOTARY PUBLIC); Filed by Brycen Bradfield (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER, BRYCEN BRADFIELD, TO REST...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketOrder (granting ex parte application); Filed by Brycen Bradfield (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPetition (for Writ of Mandate); Filed by Brycen Bradfield (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by Brycen Bradfield (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF EX-PARTE NOTICE); Filed by Brycen Bradfield (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Brycen Bradfield (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YAMSHON ELLEN RUTH