This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/01/2023 at 07:02:18 (UTC).

BRYANZLLA WILSON VS JOAN BEVERLY JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 02/15/2023 BRYANZLLA WILSON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JOAN BEVERLY JOHNSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY J. FUJIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3357

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSON BRYANZLLA

Defendant

JOHNSON JOAN BEVERLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWAIN CHARLES

Defendant Attorney

DOWNES PATRICK N.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/5/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

6/7/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/07/2023

6/7/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/07/2023

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/5/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

6/5/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice (name extension) Notice of Case Management Conference

6/5/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

5/31/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

5/23/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

4/17/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/13/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Summons Summons on Complaint

2/16/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/16/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/16/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/16/2023: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/15/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/15/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/15/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/15/2023: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/09/2024

Hearing07/09/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2024

Hearing06/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Patrick N. Downes (Attorney)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketAddress for Patrick N. Downes (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Jury Deposit scheduled for 06/16/2023 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/15/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Jury Deposit scheduled for 06/16/2023 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/09/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/07/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
02/16/2023

DocketUpdated -- Charles Swain (Attorney): Middle Name: blank

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023

DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Bryanzlla Wilson (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Bryanzlla Wilson (Plaintiff); As to: Joan Beverly Johnson (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bryanzlla Wilson (Plaintiff); As to: Joan Beverly Johnson (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bryanzlla Wilson (Plaintiff); As to: Joan Beverly Johnson (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less