This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2020 at 17:07:20 (UTC).

BRYANT, KIMBERLY VS SMITH, TERAN REYSHAWN

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 BRYANT, KIMBERLY filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against SMITH, TERAN REYSHAWN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DURON, ARMANDO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0249

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DURON, ARMANDO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRYANT KIMBERLY

Respondent

SMITH TERAN REYSHAWN

 

Court Documents

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/13/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

2/13/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

2/13/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

2/13/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

2/13/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Minute Order

3/5/2020: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department M, Duron, Armando, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.