This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2021 at 22:46:54 (UTC).

BRYAN KEITH JOHNSON, ET AL. VS DAVID CHASIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 BRYAN KEITH JOHNSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAVID CHASIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0361

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

JOHNSON BRYAN KEITH

JOHNSON LINDA MAISEL

JOHSON BRYAN KEITH

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CHASIN DAVID

CHASIN MEREDITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

KARIC STEVEN S.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

PHILLIPS THOMAS MILES

WEISS ROBERT PETER

GAGLIANO RICHARD CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES

9/15/2021: Order - ORDER NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RETAINING JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6

9/29/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RETAINING JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/15/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DOCUMENT DEMANDS AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION, AND FOR SANCTIONS

8/25/2021: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DOCUMENT DEMANDS AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION, AND FOR SANCTIONS

Notice of Settlement

9/8/2021: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

9/10/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS BYRAN KEITH JOHNSON AND LINDA MAISEL JO...)

8/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS BYRAN KEITH JOHNSON AND LINDA MAISEL JO...)

Notice of Ruling

8/3/2021: Notice of Ruling

Reply - REPLY REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DOCUMENT DEMANDS AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION, AND FOR SANCTIONS; SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATI

7/27/2021: Reply - REPLY REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DOCUMENT DEMANDS AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION, AND FOR SANCTIONS; SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATI

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DOCUMENT DEMANDS

7/21/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DOCUMENT DEMANDS

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

7/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFFS CROSS-DEFENDANTS AND AGAINST DEFENDANT CROSS-COMPLAINANTS; AND GRANTING SUMMARY ADJUDICATION IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF CROSS

7/9/2021: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFFS CROSS-DEFENDANTS AND AGAINST DEFENDANT CROSS-COMPLAINANTS; AND GRANTING SUMMARY ADJUDICATION IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF CROSS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS/CROSS-DEFENDANTS BRYAN KEITH JOHNSON AN...)

7/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS/CROSS-DEFENDANTS BRYAN KEITH JOHNSON AN...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER RE: PLAINTIFFS/CROSS-DEFENDANTS B...)

7/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER RE: PLAINTIFFS/CROSS-DEFENDANTS B...)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

7/2/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

7/2/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Separate Statement

6/17/2021: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID CHASIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTSCROSS-COMPLAINANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

6/17/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID CHASIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTSCROSS-COMPLAINANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RETAINING JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6); Filed by Bryan Keith Johson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Status Conference (ReADR and Discovery) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketOrder (Notice of Assignment of Cases for All Purposes); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Bryan Keith Johson (Plaintiff); Linda Maisel Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOrder ([PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DOCUMENT DEMANDS AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION, AND FOR SANCTIONS); Filed by Bryan Keith Johson (Plaintiff); Linda Maisel Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Status Conference (ReADR and Discovery) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (Responses to Document Demands and Document Production) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Bryan Keith Johson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by David Chasin (Defendant); Meredith Chasin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by David Chasin (Defendant); Meredith Chasin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Bryan Keith Johson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Bryan Keith Johson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Bryan Keith Johson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bryan Keith Johson (Plaintiff); Linda Maisel Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bryan Keith Johson (Plaintiff); Linda Maisel Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bryan Keith Johson (Plaintiff); Linda Maisel Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******0361 Hearing Date: August 3, 2021 Dept: O

Case Name: Johnson, et al. v. Chasin, et al.

Case No.: *******0361

Complaint Filed: 3-3-20

Hearing Date: 8-3-21

Discovery C/O: 10-1-21

Calendar No.: 4

Discover Motion C/O: 10-18-21

POS: OK

Trial Date: 11-1-21

SUBJECT: MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DOCUMENT DEMANDS AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiffs Byran Keith Johnson and Linda Maisel Johnson

RESP. PARTY: Defendants David Chasin and Meredith Chasin

TENTATIVE RULING

Plaintiffs’ motions to compel further responses is GRANTED, Defendants are to serve verified, and without objections, further code compliant supplemental responses to Plaintiff’s Requests for Production (RFP) nos. 26, 28, 29, and 86 through 92 within ____ days.

Defendants’ responses and supplemental responses do not comply with the Code of Civil Procedure. In addition to lacking verifications, they do not have the mandatory statements, affirmations and information required by CCP ;;2031.220 and 2031.230. [CCP ;2031.220: “. . . shall state that the production, inspection, copying, testing, or sampling, and related activity demanded will be allowed, either in whole or in part, and that all documents or things in the demanded category that are in the possession, custody, or control of that party… will be included in the production.” (Italic added.); CCP ;2031.230: “. . . shall affirm that a diligent search and a reasonable inquiry has been made in an effort to comply with that demand. The statement shall also specify whether the inability to comply is because the particular item has never existed, has been destroyed, has been lost, misplaced, or stolen, or has never been, or is no longer, in the possession, custody, or control of the responding party. The statement shall also set forth the name and address of any natural person or organization known or believed by that party to have possession, custody, or control of that item or category of item.”]

Likewise, the objections, aside from lacking merit do not comply with CCP ;2031.240, subdivisions (b) and(c). [“(b) If the responding party objects to the demand for inspection, copying, testing, or sampling of an item or category of item, the response shall do both of the following: (1) Identify with particularity any document, tangible thing, land, or electronically stored information falling within any category of item in the demand to which an objection is being made. (2) Set forth clearly the extent of, and the specific ground for, the objection. If an objection is based on a claim of privilege, the particular privilege invoked shall be stated. If an objection is based on a claim that the information sought is protected work product under Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 2018.010), that claim shall be expressly asserted.” (Emphasis added.) (c) If an objection to a document request is based on a claim of privilege or work product, then the response to the request shall provide sufficient factual information for other parties to evaluate the merits of that claim, including, if necessary, a privilege log.”],

Plaintiff’s purported motion to compel “document production” is DENIED. The failure to produce the documents Defendants stated would be produced must be addressed through a motion to compel compliance with the response brought under CCP ;2031.320.

Plaintiffs’ request for monetary sanctions is GRANTED, in part. The Court orders Defendants to pay Plaintiffs the sum of $8,156.05 [$8,060 for attorney’s fees (13 hours reasonably spent at $620 per hr) plus costs of $96.05] on or before the final status conference currently set for 10-21-2021.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISS, ROBERT PETER