This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 08:21:20 (UTC).

BRYAN HERNANDEZ NOPAL VS CHRISTIAN VILLALPANDO

Case Summary

On 05/09/2017 BRYAN HERNANDEZ NOPAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTIAN VILLALPANDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0702

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

VILLALPANDO CHRISTIAN

Guardian Ad Litem

HERNANDEZ RIGOBERTO

Minor

NOPAL BRYAN HERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CADENA MEGAN ESQ.

Minor Attorney

GHERMEZIAN RAYMOND ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/23/2018: Minute Order

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

11/1/2018: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Minute Order

3/26/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

3/27/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

4/9/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation

4/10/2019: Stipulation

Notice of Ruling

4/15/2019: Notice of Ruling

Order

4/23/2019: Order

Unknown

12/20/2017: Unknown

DEMAND FOR JURY

12/20/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/20/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/12/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE 2. NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT

5/9/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE 2. NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT

Unknown

5/9/2017: Unknown

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

5/9/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

5/22/2017: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM, EX PARTE

6/26/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM, EX PARTE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial (/ Final Status Conference) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketOrder (TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION); Filed by Christian Villalpando (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Christian Villalpando (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (STIPULATION FOR BINDING ARBITRATION); Filed by Christian Villalpando (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial (/ Final Status Conference) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial / Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Christian Villalpando (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM, EX PARTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE 2. NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0702    Hearing Date: March 02, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

BRYAN HERNANDEZ NOPAL,

Plaintiffs,

v.

CHRISTIAN VILLALPANDo,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****0702

Hearing Date: March 2, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

OSC RE: Dismissal

On April 23, 2019, the Court granted a stipulation to proceed to binding arbitration. The arbitration resulted in an award for Plaintiff of $34,395. Although Plaintiff is a minor, this Court has no jurisdiction to review the arbitrator’s award. Nevertheless, the Court retains jurisdiction over the award of attorney’s fees, which was not part of the arbitration, as well as the approval of expenses and costs.

The parties appeared before the Court on February 13, 2020. Plaintiff’s counsel represented, or the Court misunderstood, that the Plaintiff would turn eighteen in May 2020, based upon which the Court had stated that the money could remain in the attorney’s trust account until that time. However, the birth certificate states that Plaintiff will not turn eighteen until May 14, 2021. The Court will not approve counsel acting as custodian for the funds for that length of time.

The Court is not concerned by the requested fee. The Court would approve the requested attorney’s fees of 25%, since they are fair and reasonable under the circumstances, so counsel may list those requested fees.

However, Plaintiff’s counsel states that he will negotiate and pay the medical bills from the arbitration award. The Court needs to understand those expenses. The declaration lacks this information.

Finally, the Court would require that these funds be deposited into a blocked account. Therefore, the Court orders Plaintiff’s counsel to do the following:

1. Prepare a request on a form normally used as an expedited petition to approve compromise of a disputed action, which is Form MC-350EX. Although the Court will not disturb the arbitrator’s award, that form calls for all relevant information and will allow the Court to review and approve the deductions expeditiously.

2. On Line #14, list all of claimant’s medical expenses.

3. On Line #15(a), list the requested attorneys’ fees of 25%.

4. On Line #15(b), list all of counsel’s expenses.

5. On Line #20, please note that the funds will be deposited in a blocked account.

6. Counsel shall prepare a proposed order for the funds to be deposited into a blocked account.

The hearing on this OSC re: Dismissal is continued to March 24, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. The Court’s clerk shall provide notice.

DATED: February 28, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court