This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/28/2021 at 19:56:34 (UTC).

BRYAN DAVID BONZO, AS ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF MARTYNE ELIZABETH BONZO, DECEASED., ET AL. VS TONY J. LOPEZ, JR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 BRYAN DAVID BONZO, AS ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF MARTYNE ELIZABETH BONZO, DECEASED filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TONY J LOPEZ, JR . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5902

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BONZO BRYAN DAVID

BRYAN DAVID BONZO AS ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF MARTYNE ELIZABETH BONZO DECEASED.

BONZO ALEXANDER

Defendants

DYKES WILMA

LOPEZ TONY J. JR.

BONZO SIMON

LOPEZ TONY J. JR. AKA ANTONIO LOPEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PRECIADO MICHAEL ALAN

STUART GORDON

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR BENJAMIN

10/15/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR BENJAMIN

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR BENJAMIN

10/5/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR BENJAMIN

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/25/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

9/28/2020: PI General Order

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRYAN DAVID BONZO IN SUPPORT OF CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 129(A)(3)(A)

9/18/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRYAN DAVID BONZO IN SUPPORT OF CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 129(A)(3)(A)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/18/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2023
  • Hearing09/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • Hearing03/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • Hearing03/04/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BRYAN DAVID BONZO, as Administrator of the Estate of Martyne Elizabeth Bonzo, deceased. (Plaintiff); BRYAN DAVID BONZO (Plaintiff); BENJAMIN BONZO (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Benjamin); Filed by BRYAN DAVID BONZO, as Administrator of the Estate of Martyne Elizabeth Bonzo, deceased. (Plaintiff); BENJAMIN BONZO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Benjamin); Filed by BENJAMIN BONZO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by BRYAN DAVID BONZO (Plaintiff); BENJAMIN BONZO (Plaintiff); ALEXANDER BONZO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BRYAN DAVID BONZO, as Administrator of the Estate of Martyne Elizabeth Bonzo, deceased. (Plaintiff); BRYAN DAVID BONZO (Plaintiff); BENJAMIN BONZO (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BRYAN DAVID BONZO, as Administrator of the Estate of Martyne Elizabeth Bonzo, deceased. (Plaintiff); BRYAN DAVID BONZO (Plaintiff); BENJAMIN BONZO (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF BRYAN DAVID BONZO IN SUPPORT OF CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 129(a)(3)(A)); Filed by BRYAN DAVID BONZO, as Administrator of the Estate of Martyne Elizabeth Bonzo, deceased. (Plaintiff); BRYAN DAVID BONZO (Plaintiff); BENJAMIN BONZO (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON STUART M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRECIADO MICHAEL A