This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2021 at 15:13:27 (UTC).

BRUNO DULUC VS ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 BRUNO DULUC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2034

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DULUC BRUNO

Defendants

ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC

BONILLA JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLES CRAIG

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/31/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/31/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2024
  • Hearing08/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Hearing02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bruno Duluc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Bruno Duluc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bruno Duluc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bruno Duluc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC is a litigant