Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 05:21:08 (UTC).

BRUCE TREUHAFT VS MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 BRUCE TREUHAFT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2942

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TREUHAFT BRUCE

Defendant

MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

NASSIHI AMIR M.

Other Attorneys

WIRTZ RICHARD M.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE

7/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/7/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE REMOVED CASE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ...)

7/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE REMOVED CASE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

7/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/8/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE KEVIN ANDREW ROLDAN 13463

7/8/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE KEVIN ANDREW ROLDAN 13463

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/10/2021

3/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/10/2021

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC'S NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND PLAINTIFF OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL

12/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC'S NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND PLAINTIFF OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/9/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

12/9/2020: Answer

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

12/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Proof of Personal Service

11/12/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • Hearing11/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Hearing11/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Why, pursuant to Rule 3.22 of the Los Angeles County Court Rules, this action should not be "recorded as completed without the need to conduct a further status conference"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Status Conference (Re Removed Case) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why, pursuant to Rule 3.22 of the Los Angeles County Court Rules, this action should not be "recorded as completed without the need to conduct a further status conference") - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE); Filed by Bruce Treuhaft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Bruce Treuhaft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Kevin Andrew Roldan 13463); Filed by Bruce Treuhaft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re Removed Case; Order to Show Cause Re: ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Bruce Treuhaft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Status of Removed Case); Filed by Bruce Treuhaft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice (Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's Notice to State Court and Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal); Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Bruce Treuhaft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER); Filed by Bruce Treuhaft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Bruce Treuhaft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bruce Treuhaft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bruce Treuhaft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bruce Treuhaft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WIRTZ RICHARD M.