Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:48:06 (UTC).

BRUCE CAMPBELL VS CITY OF BELLFLOWER ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 BRUCE CAMPBELL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF BELLFLOWER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BENNY C. OSORIO and STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9165

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BENNY C. OSORIO

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CAMPBELL BRUCE

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

BELLFLOWER-SOMERSET MUTUAL WATER COMPANY

BELLFLOWER CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 100

CITY OF BELLFLOWER

LONG BEACH PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION COMPANY

ROES 1 TO 50

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

BELLFLOWER CITY OF

CITY OF BELLFLOWER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FIELDS GARY D.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESWTEEL LLP

HAITH SCOTT C.

CHAHINE MOHAMED

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HAITH SCOTT C.

Cross Defendant Attorney

OSTERBERG KEVIN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application

12/14/2018: Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application

2/6/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

2/6/2019: Minute Order

Opposition

4/17/2019: Opposition

Opposition

4/17/2019: Opposition

Opposition

4/22/2019: Opposition

Minute Order

4/22/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/1/2019: Minute Order

Other -

1/10/2018: Other -

Answer

1/10/2018: Answer

SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/20/2017: SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF, BRUCE CAMPBELL'S OPPOSITION TO CITY OF BELLFLOWER'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

11/14/2017: PLAINTIFF, BRUCE CAMPBELL'S OPPOSITION TO CITY OF BELLFLOWER'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Request for Judicial Notice

10/19/2017: Request for Judicial Notice

DEFENDANT BELLFLOWER-SOMERSET MUTUAL WATER COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/28/2017: DEFENDANT BELLFLOWER-SOMERSET MUTUAL WATER COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

7/19/2017: SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

7/19/2017: REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/4/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/4/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by City of Bellflower (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Notice (of Entry of Order Granting City's Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by City of Bellflower (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice (of Errata); Filed by Bellflower-Somerset Mutual Water Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • LETTER RE: CLERICAL ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Bruce Campbell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Bruce Campbell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Bruce Campbell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELLFLOWER CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF BELLFLOWER is a litigant

Latest cases where LONG BEACH PUBLIC TRANSPORATION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAITH SCOTT CLINTON ESQ.