This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 01:13:37 (UTC).

BROWNING FERRIS INDUSTRIES OF CALIFORNIA INC VS THE COUNTY O

Case Summary

On 04/02/2018 BROWNING FERRIS INDUSTRIES OF CALIFORNIA INC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against THE COUNTY O. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE and HOWARD L. HALM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2980

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

HOWARD L. HALM

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BROWNING-FERRIS INDUSTRIES OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES THE COUNTY OF

SLAVIN DENNIS ACTING DIRECTOR OF THE

DEPARTMENT OF REGIONAL PLANNING HEARING

DOES 1 TO 20

THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRUEN THOMAS M.

Respondent Attorney

MARY C. WICKHAM COUNTY COUNSEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/11/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/19/2018: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

11/7/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/7/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

11/21/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/24/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice

1/25/2019: Notice

Ex Parte Application

2/26/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

2/26/2019: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

6/28/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

5/4/2018: Minute Order

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS AND SANCTIONS PENDING HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; ETC.

4/6/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS AND SANCTIONS PENDING HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; ETC.

ORDER STAYING ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS AND SANCTIONS PENDING HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE;

4/6/2018: ORDER STAYING ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS AND SANCTIONS PENDING HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE;

NOTICE OF ORDER STAYING ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS AND SANCTIONS PENDING HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

4/9/2018: NOTICE OF ORDER STAYING ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS AND SANCTIONS PENDING HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

4/9/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

4/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application For Continuation Of Hearing On Petition For Writ Of Mandate; Stipulation; And Declaration Of Katherine G. Mckeon); Filed by Los Angeles, The County Of (Defendant); The Los Angeles County Department Of (Defendant); Slavin, Dennis, Acting Director of The (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Order ([Proposed] Order Granting Ex Parte Application For Continuation Of Hearing On Petition For Writ Of Mandate); Filed by Los Angeles, The County Of (Defendant); The Los Angeles County Department Of (Defendant); Slavin, Dennis, Acting Director of The (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 86; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 86; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER); Filed by Los Angeles, The County Of (Defendant); The Los Angeles County Department Of (Defendant); Slavin, Dennis, Acting Director of The (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 86; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (FOR CONTINUATION OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; STIPULATION; AND DECLARATION OF KATHERINE G. McKEON) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUATION OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; STIPULATION; AND DECLARATION OF KATHERINE G. McKEON); Filed by Los Angeles, The County Of (Defendant); The Los Angeles County Department Of (Defendant); Slavin, Dennis, Acting Director of The (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR CONTINUATION OF HEARING O...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUATION OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE); Filed by Los Angeles, The County Of (Defendant); The Los Angeles County Department Of (Defendant); Slavin, Dennis, Acting Director of The (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Notice (NOTICE RE: CONTUNUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER); Filed by Browning-Ferris Industries Of California, (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2018
  • ORDER STAYING ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS AND SANCTIONS PENDING HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Order; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS AND SANCTIONS PENDING HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROWNING-FERRIS INDUSTRIES OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUEN THOMAS M.