This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 09:12:14 (UTC).

BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS ACME METALS & STEEL SUPPLY INC., AN UNKNOWN ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 BROWN STRAUSS, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ACME METALS STEEL SUPPLY INC , AN UNKNOWN ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9545

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN STRAUSS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendants

GOLDBERG JACK

ACME METALS & STEEL SUPPLY INC. AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

ACME METALS & STEEL SUPPLY. AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

ACME METALS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

EQUITABLE TRANSITIONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINAMORE CATHERINE RIPOLONE

Other Attorneys

APANIAN MILENE

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

5/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/12/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE ON ACME METALS & STEEL SUPPLY INC., AN UNKNOWN ENTITY; ACME METALS & STEEL SUPPLY., AN UNKNOWN ENTITY; ACME METALS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

4/14/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE ON ACME METALS & STEEL SUPPLY INC., AN UNKNOWN ENTITY; ACME METALS & STEEL SUPPLY., AN UNKNOWN ENTITY; ACME METALS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Management Statement

4/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/28/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

4/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

4/29/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Ruling

5/3/2021: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Personal Service

3/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE ON ACME METALS & STEEL SUPPLY INC., AN UNKNOWN ENTITY; ACME METALS & STEEL SUPPLY., AN UNKNOWN ENTITY; ACME METALS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

3/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE ON ACME METALS & STEEL SUPPLY INC., AN UNKNOWN ENTITY; ACME METALS & STEEL SUPPLY., AN UNKNOWN ENTITY; ACME METALS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

3/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/20/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • Hearing06/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BROWN STRAUSS, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by BROWN STRAUSS, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by BROWN STRAUSS, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (As To All Named Defendants) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by BROWN STRAUSS, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (As To All Named Defendants) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF NON-SERVICE ON ACME METALS & STEEL SUPPLY INC., an unknown entity; ACME METALS & STEEL SUPPLY., an unknown entity; ACME METALS LLC, a California limited liability company); Filed by BROWN STRAUSS, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BROWN STRAUSS, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BROWN STRAUSS, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BROWN STRAUSS, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BROWN STRAUSS, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACME METALS LLC DBA ACME METALS & STEEL SUPPLY is a litigant

Latest cases where Brown Strauss, Inc., a Delaware Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer APANIAN MILENE