This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2019 at 00:42:20 (UTC).

BROWN NERI SMITH & KHAN LLP VS BEULAH DEITCH

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 BROWN NERI SMITH KHAN LLP filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against BEULAH DEITCH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2346

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BROWN NERI SMITH & KHAN LLP

Respondent

DEITCH BEULAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BROWN ETHAN

 

Court Documents

Summons

6/10/2019: Summons

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

6/10/2019: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/10/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/10/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for

6/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Notice of Related Case

6/18/2019: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order

6/18/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing on Petition

6/25/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Proof of Personal Service

6/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Hearing on Petition

7/10/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Opposition

7/31/2019: Opposition

Declaration

8/15/2019: Declaration

Reply

8/15/2019: Reply

Minute Order

8/22/2019: Minute Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award) - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Suzanne Onuki, CSR# 13734)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (OF ETHAN J. BROWN IN SUPPORT OF BROWN NERI SMITH & KHAN LLP'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD); Filed by Brown Neri Smith & Khan LLP (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketReply (BROWN NERI SMITH & KHAN LLP'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD); Filed by Brown Neri Smith & Khan LLP (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketOpposition (RESPONDENT?S OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO CONFIRM ATTORNEYCLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD; DECLARATION OF ERIN L. GREY IN SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by Beulah Deitch (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition (TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD); Filed by Brown Neri Smith & Khan LLP (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brown Neri Smith & Khan LLP (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition (ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD); Filed by Brown Neri Smith & Khan LLP (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 34; Court Order - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 06/18/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Brown Neri Smith & Khan LLP (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 06/18/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brown Neri Smith & Khan LLP (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Brown Neri Smith & Khan LLP (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by Brown Neri Smith & Khan LLP (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROWN NERI SMITH & KHAN LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN ETHAN