This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2022 at 22:44:10 (UTC).

BROWN, JAMES R. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 BROWN, JAMES R - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOGDANOFF, LEE R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1253

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOGDANOFF, LEE R.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BROWN JAMECE V.

BROWN ROBERT

Decedent

BROWN JAMES R.

Interested Parties

BROWN MARGARITA MAYA

BROWN MINNIE LOIS

Other

BROWN JAMAR

Not Classified By Court

SETTLE KEITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ARTIS TAB L

Interested Party and Other Attorney

KUREDJIAN ARAM

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Minnie Brown

7/14/2022: Declaration - Minnie Brown

Petition - Authority - Petition to Authorize and Instruct

5/16/2022: Petition - Authority - Petition to Authorize and Instruct

Request - Special Notice

5/17/2022: Request - Special Notice

Objection - to proposed action

5/18/2022: Objection - to proposed action

Ex Parte - Petition - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER INSTRUCTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE TO SELL REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 7841 W. 83RD STREET, PLAYA DEL REY, CALIFORNIA; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AU

5/19/2022: Ex Parte - Petition - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER INSTRUCTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE TO SELL REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 7841 W. 83RD STREET, PLAYA DEL REY, CALIFORNIA; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AU

Ex Parte - Opposition ($435) - OBJECTORS' OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER INSTRUCTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE TO SELL REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 7841 W. 83RD STREET, PLAYA DEL REY, CALIF

5/20/2022: Ex Parte - Opposition ($435) - OBJECTORS' OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER INSTRUCTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE TO SELL REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 7841 W. 83RD STREET, PLAYA DEL REY, CALIF

Ex Parte - Order

5/23/2022: Ex Parte - Order

Notice - Proposed Action - Objection

5/24/2022: Notice - Proposed Action - Objection

Request - Special Notice

5/24/2022: Request - Special Notice

Notice - Proposed Action - Objection

5/24/2022: Notice - Proposed Action - Objection

Supplement - First Supplement

6/24/2022: Supplement - First Supplement

Bond - suretec

4/11/2022: Bond - suretec

Letters (Initial)

4/13/2022: Letters (Initial)

Order - Probate

3/18/2022: Order - Probate

Declaration - from Minnie Brown

2/18/2022: Declaration - from Minnie Brown

Minute Order

2/25/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/25/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/7/2022: Minute Order

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2023
  • Hearing06/29/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • Hearing07/26/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Authority Hearing (Non-Trust)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Minnie Brown ); Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSupplement (First Supplement ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNotice - Proposed Action (Objection ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNotice - Proposed Action (Objection ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEx Parte - Order

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document (Paternity Verification ); Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUREDJIAN ARAM