This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2023 at 07:56:03 (UTC).

BROTHERHOOD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 BROTHERHOOD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III and KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9375

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROTHERHOOD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYCON HOWARD D.

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN C.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/20/2022: Complaint

Notice of Related Case

12/20/2022: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

1/12/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 01/12/2023

1/12/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 01/12/2023

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION AND CASE REASSIGNMENT

1/25/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION AND CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/27/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/27/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

4/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/23/2023: Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2023
  • Hearing06/29/2023 at 2:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDefendants Southern California Edison Company and Edison Internationals Answer to Complaint; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant); As to: Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/29/2023 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/16/2023 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14 updated: Result Date to 05/16/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/16/2023 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketCase numbers 22STCV39375, 23STCV03896, 20STCV42356 are related; case number 20STCV42356 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 14 - Hon. Kenneth R. Freeman; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less