This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2023 at 14:28:56 (UTC).

BROTHERHOOD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 BROTHERHOOD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9375

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROTHERHOOD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYCON HOWARD D.

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN C.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/20/2022: Complaint

Notice of Related Case

12/20/2022: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

1/12/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 01/12/2023

1/12/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 01/12/2023

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION AND CASE REASSIGNMENT

1/25/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION AND CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/27/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/27/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

4/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/23/2023: Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/29/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/5/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE. BELLWETHER PLAINTIFF SELECTION)

8/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE. BELLWETHER PLAINTIFF SELECTION)

Minute Order - (AMENDED)

9/5/2023: Minute Order - (AMENDED)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2024
  • Hearing04/09/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2024
  • Hearing01/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Readiness Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2023
  • Hearing11/02/2023 at 2:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/09/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/02/2023 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/24/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/05/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • DocketCourt Order scheduled for 09/05/2023 at 04:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • DocketAmended Minute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • DocketCourt Order scheduled for 09/05/2023 at 04:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14 updated: Result Date to 09/05/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference scheduled for 01/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 14 - Hon. Kenneth R. Freeman; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less