This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/06/2021 at 19:26:41 (UTC).

BROOKSHIRE AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC VS VEONCA PAREL

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 BROOKSHIRE AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against VEONCA PAREL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0579

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROOKSHIRE AVENUE APARTMENTS LLC

Defendant

PAREL VEONCA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS CHRIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by Brookshire Avenue Apartments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Brookshire Avenue Apartments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Brookshire Avenue Apartments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brookshire Avenue Apartments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketVerification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance; Filed by Brookshire Avenue Apartments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Veonca Parel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Brookshire Avenue Apartments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brookshire Avenue Apartments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Brookshire Avenue Apartments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brookshire Avenue Apartments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROOKSHIRE AVENUE APARTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS