This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 04:31:09 (UTC).

BROOKE ZUTLER VS ADM GROUP LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 BROOKE ZUTLER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ADM GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EDWARD B. MORETON and WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3560

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EDWARD B. MORETON

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZUTLER BROOKE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FOREST CITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT LLC

FOREST CITY ENTERPRISES INC.

ZEPULVEDA MARCUS

MILL CREEK RESIDENTIAL TRUST

FC BROADWAY AND HILL LLC

BROOKFIELD ASSET MANAGEMENT

FOREST CITY ENTERPRISES L.P.

ADM GROUP

ADM GROUP LLC

SEPULVEDA MARCOS

AXIS

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ADM GROUP LLC

SEPULVEDA MARCOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

UPTON JOHN H.

LENKOV JEFFREY

VARELA GILBERT

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LENKOV JEFFREY

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

VARELA GILBERT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT STATUS CONFERENCE RE BANKRUPTCY STATUS; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

8/18/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT STATUS CONFERENCE RE BANKRUPTCY STATUS; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

Notice - NOTICE OF TERMINATION OR MODIFICATION OF STAY

8/6/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TERMINATION OR MODIFICATION OF STAY

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY STATUS; FSC AND TRIAL

6/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY STATUS; FSC AND TRIAL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY) OF 06/14/2021

6/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY) OF 06/14/2021

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

12/16/2020: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Answer

11/16/2020: Answer

Answer

10/5/2020: Answer

Answer

9/11/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

9/11/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

8/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/26/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/22/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • Hearing12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Hearing12/06/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (at Status Conference Re Bankruptcy Status; Final Status Conference and Trial); Filed by ADM Group LLC (Defendant); ADM Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Termination or Modification of Stay); Filed by ADM Group LLC (Defendant); ADM Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy Status; FSC and Trial); Filed by Brooke Zutler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brooke Zutler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brooke Zutler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brooke Zutler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brooke Zutler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brooke Zutler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Brooke Zutler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brooke Zutler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AXIS is a litigant

Latest cases where ADM GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where FC BROADWAY AND HILL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FOREST CITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC is a litigant