This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2019 at 01:38:02 (UTC).

BROOKE RIDENOUR VS HOULIHAN LOKEY INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/15/2018 BROOKE RIDENOUR filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HOULIHAN LOKEY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8304

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIDENOUR BROOKE

Defendants

MINN JENNIFER

HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS INC.

HOULIHAN LOKEY CONSULTING INC.

HOULIHAN LOKEY INC.

HOULIHAN LOKEY

HOULIHAN LOKEY CAPITAL INC.

KLEIN SANDRA

HOULIHAN LOKEY REAL ESTATE GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTONINO EDWARD ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

BATHAEE SADAF

TERRY JENNIFER C ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/14/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Continuance

10/11/2018: Notice of Continuance

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

10/2/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

10/2/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Separate Statement

10/11/2018: Separate Statement

Motion for Order

10/11/2018: Motion for Order

Minute Order

10/18/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. ONE, NOS. 151 - 153, ETC

9/4/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. ONE, NOS. 151 - 153, ETC

PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL, SET NO. O

9/4/2018: PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL, SET NO. O

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL, SET NO. ONE, INTERROGATORY NOS. 15.1 AND 17.1, ETC

9/4/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL, SET NO. ONE, INTERROGATORY NOS. 15.1 AND 17.1, ETC

PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET

9/4/2018: PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET

Minute Order

7/17/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

7/17/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

7/12/2018: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/19/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/2/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING THE INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF BROOKE RIDENOUR; ETC.

7/3/2018: DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING THE INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF BROOKE RIDENOUR; ETC.

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY, INC.'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING THE INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF BROOKE RIDENOUR

7/3/2018: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY, INC.'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING THE INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF BROOKE RIDENOUR

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Plaintiff's Requests for Production of Documents, Set No. One; and Request for Sanctions against Defendant Sandra Klein and her Counsel Arent Fox LLP in the amount of $4,060.00) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Brooke Ridenour (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Brooke Ridenour (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Brooke Ridenour (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. GENDER / SEX/ SEXUAL ORIENTATION DISCRIMINATION ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brooke Ridenour (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOULIHAN LOKEY HOWARD & ZUKIN is a litigant

Latest cases where Houlihan Lokey, Inc. is a litigant