This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2023 at 00:00:45 (UTC).

BROOKE ANDERSON, ET AL. VS HIGHLANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 BROOKE ANDERSON, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HIGHLANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT and RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5581

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KEANE LYNDA

ANDERSON BROOKE

Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

CUOZZO CHRISTY

FRANK REVERE AS TRUSTEE OF THE ADALYN B. PACKER LIVING TRUST

SANOWICZ HILLEL

HIGHLANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATION

THE ADALYN B. PACKER LIVING TRUST

GRCEVIC DOUGLAS DBA UNIVERSAL MAGNESITE

ROES 1-20 INCLUSIVE

HIGHLANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC.

Defendant and Interested Party

FRANK REVERE AS TRUSTEE OF THE ADALYN B. PACKER LIVING TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUTTENBERG KENNETH GARY

Defendant Attorneys

MURPHY MICHAEL B

CARPENTER GREGORY J.

REVERE FRANK

CHODOS JONATHAN P.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

STONE JASON M.

Cross Defendant Attorneys

SMITH SUMMER MICHELLE

TICKNER KERE K.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/8/2023: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...)

2/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION OF SANOWICZ TO MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION

2/17/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION OF SANOWICZ TO MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION

Opposition - NON OPPOSITION TO NOTICE FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

2/16/2023: Opposition - NON OPPOSITION TO NOTICE FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SUMMER M. SMITH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HIGHLANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATIONS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

2/10/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SUMMER M. SMITH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HIGHLANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATIONS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

2/10/2023: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE (FSC))

2/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE (FSC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY DEFT/CROSS-CO CHRISTY CUOZ...)

1/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY DEFT/CROSS-CO CHRISTY CUOZ...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OF SANOWICZ TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF CHRISTY CUOZZO

1/18/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION OF SANOWICZ TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF CHRISTY CUOZZO

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT CHRISTY CUOZZO'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING A MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, PROVIDING LEAVE TO AMEND HER C

1/18/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT CHRISTY CUOZZO'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING A MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, PROVIDING LEAVE TO AMEND HER C

Clerk's Notice of Full Payment of Fees Required

1/18/2023: Clerk's Notice of Full Payment of Fees Required

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT AGAINST H...)

1/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT AGAINST H...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OF SANOWICZ TO CUOZZO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT AND JOINDER IN HOA OPPOSITION

12/30/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION OF SANOWICZ TO CUOZZO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT AND JOINDER IN HOA OPPOSITION

Opposition - DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT HIGHLANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATIONS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CHRISTY CUOZZOS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST HIGHLAND OWNERS ASSOCIATION

12/30/2022: Opposition - DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT HIGHLANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATIONS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CHRISTY CUOZZOS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST HIGHLAND OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HE...)

12/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HE...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OF SANOWICZ TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF CHRISTY CUOZZO

12/23/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION OF SANOWICZ TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF CHRISTY CUOZZO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AN...)

12/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AN...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION CHRISTY CUOZZO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANT CHRISTY CUOZZOS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST

12/22/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION CHRISTY CUOZZO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANT CHRISTY CUOZZOS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST

105 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal - Complaint, with prejudice: Filed By: Brooke Anderson (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Name Extension: - Complaint, with prejudice ; Result Date: 03/10/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Frank Revere, as Trustee of the Adalyn B. Packer Living Trust Dated February 11, 2000 (Defendant), Hillel Sanowicz (Defendant), Highlands Owners Association (Defendant), Christy Cuozzo (Defendant) to Hillel Sanowicz (Defendant), Highlands Owners Association (Defendant), Frank Revere, as Trustee of the Adalyn B. Packer Living Trust Dated February 11, 2000 (Defendant), Christy Cuozzo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by Brooke Anderson, et al. on 04/08/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Brooke Anderson as to Highlands Owners Association, Christy Cuozzo, Frank Revere, as Trustee of the Adalyn B. Packer Living Trust Dated February 11, 2000, and Hillel Sanowicz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Brooke Anderson (Plaintiff); As to: Highlands Owners Association (Defendant); Christy Cuozzo (Defendant); Frank Revere, as Trustee of the Adalyn B. Packer Living Trust Dated February 11, 2000 (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review [CLERICAL] Re Payment of Fees Due scheduled for 02/01/2023 at 04:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 15 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) - Defendant Highlands Owners Association's Notice of Motion and Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement: As To Parties: Brooke Anderson (Plaintiff), Lynda Keane (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Summer M. Smith in Support of Defendant Highlands Owners Association's Notice of Motion and Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement: As To Parties: Brooke Anderson (Plaintiff), Lynda Keane (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) - Defendant Highlands Owners Association's Notice of Motion and Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement: Filed By: Highlands Owners Association (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 02/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by Brooke Anderson, et al. on 04/08/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) by Deft Highlands Owners Association [NO CRS#]- scheduled for 02/21/2023 at 09:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 15 updated: Result Date to 02/21/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
288 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Highlands Owners Association, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 05/11/2021 at 09:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 15 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 05/25/2021 09:15 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Brooke Anderson (Plaintiff); As to: Christy Cuozzo (Defendant); Service Date: 03/11/2021; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Brooke Anderson (Plaintiff); Lynda Keane (Plaintiff); As to: Frank Revere, as Trustee of the Adalyn B. Packer Living Trust Dated February 11, 2000 (Defendant); Service Date: 02/24/2021; Service Cost: 233.45; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brooke Anderson (Plaintiff); Lynda Keane (Plaintiff); As to: Highlands Owners Association, a California Corporation (Defendant); Christy Cuozzo (Defendant); Frank Revere, as Trustee of the Adalyn B. Packer Living Trust Dated February 11, 2000 (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard L. Fruin in Department 15 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brooke Anderson (Plaintiff); Lynda Keane (Plaintiff); As to: Highlands Owners Association, a California Corporation (Defendant); Christy Cuozzo (Defendant); Frank Revere, as Trustee of the Adalyn B. Packer Living Trust Dated February 11, 2000 (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brooke Anderson (Plaintiff); Lynda Keane (Plaintiff); As to: Highlands Owners Association, a California Corporation (Defendant); Christy Cuozzo (Defendant); Frank Revere, as Trustee of the Adalyn B. Packer Living Trust Dated February 11, 2000 (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance; Filed by: Brooke Anderson (Plaintiff); Lynda Keane (Plaintiff); As to: Highlands Owners Association, a California Corporation (Defendant); Christy Cuozzo (Defendant); Frank Revere, as Trustee of the Adalyn B. Packer Living Trust Dated February 11, 2000 (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less