This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/19/2023 at 12:09:08 (UTC).

BROADBAND ITV, INC. VS ORRICK HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE, LLP

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 BROADBAND ITV, INC filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against ORRICK HERRINGTON SUTCLIFFE, LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6407

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROADBAND ITV INC.

Defendant

ORRICK HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PARKER DAVID B.

DENLINGER JUSTIN D.

Defendant Attorneys

MCMONIGLE JOSEPH P.

ALLEN SYDNEY E.

SULLIVAN JOHN B.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/4/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/3/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/11/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/29/2021

6/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/29/2021

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CHANGE VENUE AND PROPOSED ORDER

6/29/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CHANGE VENUE AND PROPOSED ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

7/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS

8/10/2021: Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS

Notice of Outgoing Transfer

8/10/2021: Notice of Outgoing Transfer

Receipt for Transmitted Record

8/10/2021: Receipt for Transmitted Record

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

RECEIPT - RETURNED RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD- SAN FRANCISCO CO- CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE - CGC-21-594526

9/14/2021: RECEIPT - RETURNED RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD- SAN FRANCISCO CO- CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE - CGC-21-594526

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketReturned Receipt for Transmitted Record- San Francisco Co- Civic Center Courthouse - CGC-21-594526; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase is transferred to San Francisco county

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketReceipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certification of Reproduced Court Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCase is transferred to San Francisco county

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Transfer/Reclassification Pending

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- John B. Sullivan (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Long & Levit to Long & Levit LLP; Middle Name changed from Brendan to B.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketAddress for David B. Parker (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: As To Parties changed from Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP (Defendant) to Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- David B. Parker (Attorney): Middle Name: B.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketAddress for David B. Parker (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Broadband iTV, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Broadband iTV, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Broadband iTV, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gregory Keosian in Department 61 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: Status Date changed from 05/03/2021 to 04/30/2021; As To Parties changed from Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP (Defendant) to Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Status Date changed from 05/03/2021 to 04/30/2021; As To Parties changed from Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP (Defendant) to Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: Status Date changed from 05/03/2021 to 04/30/2021; As To Parties changed from Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP (Defendant) to Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less