This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2021 at 01:14:51 (UTC).

BRITTNEY MEJICO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS REDFIN CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 BRITTNEY MEJICO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against REDFIN CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7100

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MEJICO AN INDIVIDUAL BRITTNEY

MEJICO BRITTNEY

Defendants

REDFIN CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION

REDFIN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT J.

Defendant Attorney

HURLEY GREG

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/6/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/3/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Request for Judicial Notice

6/3/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/23/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

6/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT REDFIN CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STAY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT

6/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT REDFIN CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STAY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT

Request for Judicial Notice

6/7/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/7/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Case Management Statement

8/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

10/28/2021: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Brittney Mejico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Brittney Mejico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brittney Mejico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Brittney Mejico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice (DEFENDANT REDFIN CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STAY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT); Filed by Redfin Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Redfin Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Redfin Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike ((Amended)); Filed by Redfin Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Redfin Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brittney Mejico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Brittney Mejico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brittney Mejico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REDFIN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HURLEY GREG