This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 04:46:44 (UTC).

BRITTNEY MEJICO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS POLICYGENIUS INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 BRITTNEY MEJICO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against POLICYGENIUS INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9908

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEJICO AN INDIVIDUAL BRITTNEY

Defendant

POLICYGENIUS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FERRELL SCOTT

FERRELL SCOTT J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/29/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/2/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GREGORY F. HURLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT POLICYGENIUS INC.S DEMURRER RE: FAILURE TO MEET AND CONFER

12/2/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GREGORY F. HURLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT POLICYGENIUS INC.S DEMURRER RE: FAILURE TO MEET AND CONFER

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

11/29/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

11/29/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/29/2021

11/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/29/2021

Proof of Personal Service

12/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • Hearing04/14/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Hearing03/11/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brittney Mejico, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF GREGORY F. HURLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT POLICYGENIUS INC.S DEMURRER RE: FAILURE TO MEET AND CONFER); Filed by Policygenius Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docketat 11:09 AM in Department 57; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Brittney Mejico, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brittney Mejico, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brittney Mejico, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Brittney Mejico, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL SCOTT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL SCOTT J