This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2023 at 10:57:28 (UTC).

BRITTNEY MARIE WILKIN VS RICARDO HERNANDEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2022 BRITTNEY MARIE WILKIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RICARDO HERNANDEZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1180

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILKIN BRITTNEY MARIE

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 25

DORECK STEPHEN

HERNANDEZ RICARDO

MOEBUS JOHN

SALDIVAR ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OSTOIA ADINA A

JAMSHEED KATE

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE/NEGLIGENCE PER SE; 2. WRONGFUL DEATH

11/8/2022: Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE/NEGLIGENCE PER SE; 2. WRONGFUL DEATH

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/8/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/10/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

3/10/2023: Case Management Statement

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

3/24/2023: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

3/24/2023: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/27/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

3/27/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/19/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

5/25/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2023
  • Hearing07/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • Hearing06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/07/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 05/25/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Brittney Marie Wilkin (Plaintiff); As to: DOES 1 to 25 (Defendant); Service Date: 03/25/2023; Service Cost: 123.44; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 07/26/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Ricardo Hernandez (Defendant); Stephen Doreck (Defendant); Andrew Saldivar (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Brittney Marie Wilkin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brittney Marie Wilkin (Plaintiff); As to: Ricardo Hernandez (Defendant); Stephen Doreck (Defendant); Andrew Saldivar (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE/NEGLIGENCE PER SE; 2. WRONGFUL DEATH; Filed by: Brittney Marie Wilkin (Plaintiff); As to: Ricardo Hernandez (Defendant); Stephen Doreck (Defendant); Andrew Saldivar (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brittney Marie Wilkin (Plaintiff); As to: Ricardo Hernandez (Defendant); Stephen Doreck (Defendant); Andrew Saldivar (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 22TRCV01180 Hearing Date: May 25, 2023 Dept: 8

Tentative Ruling

HEARING DATE: May 25, 2023

CASE NUMBER: 22TRCV01180

CASE NAME: Brittney Marie Wilkin v. Ricardo Hernandez, et al.

TRIAL DATE: None Set.

MOTION: (1) Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Tentative Rulings: (1) Motion to be Relieved as Counsel is DENIED without prejudice to Ms. Ostoia providing more corroboration for the accuracy of the Oxnard address where the papers were purported to be personally served to “the party or the person authorized to receive process for the party.” The First Legal proof of service could be re-filed or amended with unequivocal proof that service was given to Ms. Wilkin personally, or Ms. Ostoia could provide other corroborating evidence such as a phone call with Plaintiff, and email from plaintiff, or other proof that the Oxnard address is valid.

I. Background

On November 8, 2022, Plaintiff, Brittney Marie Wilkin (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendants Ricardo Hernandez, Stephen Doreck, Andrew Saldivar, John Moebus, and DOES 1 through 25. On March 24, 2023, Plaintiff’s attorney, Adina A. Ostoia, Esq. (“Ostoia”) filed a Motion to be Relieved as Counsel.

II. Legal Standard & Discussion

Code of Civil Procedure 284 states that “the attorney in an action…may be changed at any time before or after judgment or final determination, as follows: (1) upon the consent of both client and attorney…; (2) upon the order of the court, upon the application of either client or attorney, after notice from one to the other.” (Code Civ. Proc. 284; CRC 3.1362.) The withdrawal request may be denied if it would cause an injustice or undue delay in proceeding; but the court's discretion in this area is one to be exercised reasonably. (See Mandell v. Superior (1977) 67 Cal.App.3d 1, 4; Lempert v. Superior Court (2003) 112 Cal.App.4th 1161, 1173.)

In making a motion to be relieved as counsel, the attorney must comply with procedures set forth in Cal. Rules of Court 3.1362. The motion must be made using mandatory forms: Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel directed to the client – Civil (MC-051); Declaration “stating in general terms and without compromising the confidentiality of the attorney-client relationship” reasons the motion was brought (MC-052); and a Proposed Order (MC-053). (Ibid.) The forms must be filed and served on all parties who have appeared in the case. (Ibid.)

Here, Plaintiff’s counsel, Adina Ostoia, moves the Court to relieve her as attorney of record for Plaintiff. Ms. Ostoia properly filed a Notice of Motion, Motion to be Relieved as Counsel, Declaration, and Proposed Order in accordance with Cal. Rules of Court 3.1362. Per the Proof of Service filed by First Legal, a registered process server, the motion, declaration, and proposed order for the pending motion were served on Plaintiff “or person authorized to receive process for the party” by hand at an address in Oxnard. The Oxnard address is listed in an exhibit to Ms. Ostoia’s declaration as the first-listed location in what appears to be a people search printout. Ms. Ostoia’s declaration states that she confirmed the client’s address exclusively by means of “TLO,” which appears to be a Web-based attorney service. That is not sufficient for the Court. The Person Search exhibit lists email addresses, an (805) area code phone number, recently flagged addresses on the same street in Auberry California, and an older address in San Pedro.

In her declaration Ms. Ostoia notes that “[t]here has been a breakdown in attorney-client communication such that continued representation is no longer feasible.” She further notes that they “have been unable to have the client sign the substitution of attorney.”

The Court needs to have more confidence in the evidence that the Oxnard address is in fact where Ms. Wilkin can be served with papers going forward, if and when the Court grants withdrawal of counsel of record. Defendants and the Court need to be able to serve notices and other papers on Plaintiff if she becomes self-represented. A further declaration from Ms. Ostoia that Ms. Wilkin confirmed the Oxnard address within the last 30 days would help, the process server’s physical description of the person served without the inclusion of a conjunction (“or) in the proof of service, or other confirmatory evidence. The Court will inquire at the hearing if and when such supplementary evidence can be provided.