This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2022 at 16:59:09 (UTC).

BRITTANY HILL VS TERRACES AR PARK MARINO LP, THE

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 BRITTANY HILL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against TERRACES AR PARK MARINO LP, THE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0113

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HILL BRITTANY

Defendant

TERRACES AR PARK MARINO LP THE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAZANDJIAN HAIG B

Defendant Attorney

LOW NATHAN K.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/6/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

11/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 11/06/2020

11/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 11/06/2020

Declaration Pursuant to 1717 CC re: Attorney Fees - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 1717 CC RE: ATTORNEY FEES DECLARATION OF HAIG B. KAZANDJIAN IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING APPROVAL OF REPRESENT

11/25/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 1717 CC re: Attorney Fees - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 1717 CC RE: ATTORNEY FEES DECLARATION OF HAIG B. KAZANDJIAN IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING APPROVAL OF REPRESENT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING APPROVAL OF REPRESENTATIVE PAGA SETTLEMENT

11/25/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING APPROVAL OF REPRESENTATIVE PAGA SETTLEMENT

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] FINAL JUDGMENT

12/15/2020: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] FINAL JUDGMENT

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING REPRESENTATIVE PAGA SETTLEMENT

12/15/2020: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING REPRESENTATIVE PAGA SETTLEMENT

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

12/17/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Case Management Statement

7/13/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/16/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/24/2020

3/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/24/2020

Answer

3/9/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

2/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/30/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketOrder (Order Approving Representative PAGA Settlement); Filed by BRITTANY HILL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment; Filed by BRITTANY HILL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation Requesting Approval of Representative PAGA Settlement); Filed by BRITTANY HILL (Plaintiff); TERRACES AR PARK MARINO LP, THE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 1717 CC re: Attorney Fees (Declaration of Haig B. Kazandjian in Support of Joint Stipulation Requesting Approval of Representative PAGA Settlement); Filed by BRITTANY HILL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference); Filed by BRITTANY HILL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by TERRACES AR PARK MARINO LP, THE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BRITTANY HILL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BRITTANY HILL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BRITTANY HILL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BRITTANY HILL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Low, Nathan K