Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2020 at 00:53:29 (UTC).

BRITTANY GRAY VS STRATFORD-COMPTON PARK TOWNHOMES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 BRITTANY GRAY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against STRATFORD-COMPTON PARK TOWNHOMES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6078

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

GRAY BRITTANY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

YANYAN LIU

STRATFORD-COMPTON PARK TOWNHOMES

ZHANG YUE

LIU YANYAN

GRAY BRITTANY

ROES 1-20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHOLIAN ARTIN

Attorney at Gholian Law Group

13333 Ventura Blvd Ste 207

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ZHANG YUE 'ALAN'

GAGLIANO RICHARD C

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

GAGLIANO RICHARD C

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2019: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/8/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

5/23/2019: Answer

Answer

4/2/2019: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/3/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

3/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

Cross-Complaint

3/6/2019: Cross-Complaint

Case Management Statement

2/15/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/13/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/6/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/31/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/12/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/13/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/26/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Liu Yanyan (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Brittany Gray (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Brittany Gray (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketOrder (Proposed Order Approving Good Faith Settlement); Filed by Stratford-Compton Park Townhomes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Stratford-Compton Park Townhomes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketApplication for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Filed by Stratford-Compton Park Townhomes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Liu Yanyan (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Yue Zhang (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Brittany Gray (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Brittany Gray (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Brittany Gray (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brittany Gray (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brittany Gray (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brittany Gray (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GHOLIAN ARTIN