This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/06/2020 at 02:23:04 (UTC).

BRITTANY FEENEY VS BOUCHON BEVERLY HILLS ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2018 BRITTANY FEENEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BOUCHON BEVERLY HILLS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9299

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FEENEY BRITTANY

Defendants and Respondents

THOMAS KELLER RESTAURANT GROUP

BOUCHON BEVERLY HILLS LP

BOUCHON BEVERLY HILLS LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

KRM INC

BOUCHON LLC

BOUCHON LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GUTMAN LAW

BEEM & ISLEY

LAW GUTMAN

GUTMAN ALAN SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

MITTSKUS DANIELLE D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/30/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

11/25/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE) OF 11/01/2019

11/1/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE) OF 11/01/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE)

11/1/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/24/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE; VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF CLIFFORD L. BEEM TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE

8/26/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE; VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF CLIFFORD L. BEEM TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

9/14/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

Request for Dismissal -

10/9/2018: Request for Dismissal -

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

10/15/2018: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/17/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/17/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/17/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/17/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF CLIFFORD L. BEEM TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE

6/12/2018: APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF CLIFFORD L. BEEM TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Brittany Feeney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order); Filed by Brittany Feeney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF JOHN JUENGER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF CLIFFORD L. BEEM TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE); Filed by Brittany Feeney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF CLIFFORD L. BEEM TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE); Filed by Brittany Feeney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice) of 11/01/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Brittany Feeney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Alan Scott Gutman (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF CLIFFORD L. BEEM TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brittany Feeney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR NEGLIGENCE AND VICARIOUS LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC709299    Hearing Date: November 22, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE

Clifford L. Beem (“Applicant”) seeks admission to appear as counsel pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff in this action. Based on the application, Applicant is a member in good standing in the courts of admission and is not currently suspended or disbarred in any court. Applicant has not filed any pro hac vice applications in California in the past two years. Applicant also provides his residence and business address, as well as local counsel Alan S. Gutman’s information.

The application complies with the requirements of California Rules of Court, Rule 9.40, including serving notice and required fees on the State Bar of California. The unopposed application is GRANTED. It is ordered that Clifford L. Beem be admitted to appear as counsel pro hac vice for the purpose of representing Plaintiff in this action. Applicant shall be subject to all applicable rules of this Court.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.

Case Number: BC709299    Hearing Date: November 01, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO ADMIT CLIFFORD L. BEEM PRO HAC VICE

Clifford L. Beem (“Applicant”) seeks admission to appear as counsel pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff Brittney Feeney in this action along with Alan S. Gutman, an active member of the State Bar of California. (Declaration of Clifford L. Beem.) Applicant is a resident of Colorado and is a member in good standing admitted to practice before the Supreme Court of the State of Colorado and United States District Court for the District of Colorado in 1968. Applicant is not a resident of California and does not regularly engage in business in California. Applicant has applied and appeared pro hac vice in California State Court zero times in the past two years.

The application fails to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 9.40, which requires the applicant to serve notice and required fees on the State Bar of California. The unopposed application is DENIED without prejudice.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. The Court will be dark on November 1, 2019. A party requesting argument should contact Department 4B for an alternate hearing date.