This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 01:38:18 (UTC).

BRISTOL HOLDINGS, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS DOES 1 THROUGH 10, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 BRISTOL HOLDINGS, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DOES 1 THROUGH 10. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0023

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRISTOL HOLDINGS LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

MILLCREEK FARMING ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ELE-EDGEWATER PROPERTIES LLC A NEVEDA SERIES LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

STUEVE BROS FARMS OF DELANO LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

STUEVE BROTHERS FARMS OF OAKDALE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILILTY COMPANY

STUEVE BROS. FARMS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

MILL CREEK COMMUNITIES LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

THE EHE FAMILY FOUNDATION A NOT-FOR-PROFIT CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

OLE-RESERVOIR ALMOND RANCH ONE LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GOLD LION EQUITY LLC A NEVADA SERIES LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURSCH JORDAN NILS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/11/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/11/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/11/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 05/03/2021

5/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 05/03/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

5/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bristol Holdings, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bristol Holdings, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bristol Holdings, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STUEVE BROTHERS FARMS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BRISTOL HOLDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where STUEVE BROS. FARMS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant