This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 23:33:57 (UTC).

BRION WELLS VS LONG BEACH TRANSIT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 BRION WELLS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against LONG BEACH TRANSIT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3286

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS BRION

Defendants

CITY OF LONG BEACH

LONG BEACH PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION COMPANY

LONG BEACH TRANSIT

MEDINA ENRIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOUMANIAN NANCY PRAPION

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/23/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/29/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

1/12/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • Hearing03/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Brion Wells (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Brion Wells (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brion Wells (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brion Wells (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH PUBLIC TRANSPORATION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LONG BEACH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUMANIAN NANCY PRAPION