This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 13:56:40 (UTC).

BRINK ANSELL, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, HILARY ANSELL VS LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 BRINK ANSELL, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, HILARY ANSELL filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6929

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRINK ANSELL A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM HILARY ANSELL

Defendants

BYRNE M.D. FRANCESCA

LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER DBA MILLER CHILDREN'S & WOMEN'S HOSPITAL LONG BEACH

BRENNAN M.D. SARAH

PACIFIC CARDIOVASCULAR ASSOCIATES MEDICAL GROUP INC.

MEMORIALCARE MEDICAL FOUNDATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURKE SEAN

Defendant Attorneys

BURNS HUGH R.

AGRUSA LISA M.

Other Attorneys

ARGOS JASON NICHOLAS

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/24/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/17/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/16/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

7/17/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

7/20/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/21/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/21/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/21/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/21/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/21/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/21/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial

4/16/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR BRINK

3/30/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR BRINK

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/20/2020: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • Hearing02/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Hearing03/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • Hearing02/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Brink Ansell, a minor, by and through his Guardian ad Litem, Hilary Ansell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Francesca Byrne, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Brink Ansell, a minor, by and through his Guardian ad Litem, Hilary Ansell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Brink Ansell, a minor, by and through his Guardian ad Litem, Hilary Ansell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Brink Ansell, a minor, by and through his Guardian ad Litem, Hilary Ansell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pacific Cardiovascular Associates Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant); Sarah Brennan, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Brink Ansell, a minor, by and through his Guardian ad Litem, Hilary Ansell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Brink Ansell, a minor, by and through his Guardian ad Litem, Hilary Ansell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Brink Ansell, a minor, by and through his Guardian ad Litem, Hilary Ansell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Brink); Filed by Brink Ansell, a minor, by and through his Guardian ad Litem, Hilary Ansell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brink Ansell, a minor, by and through his Guardian ad Litem, Hilary Ansell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brink Ansell, a minor, by and through his Guardian ad Litem, Hilary Ansell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEMORIALCARE MEDICAL FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARGOS JASON NICHOLAS