This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2021 at 02:18:53 (UTC).

BRIELLE COHEN VS 15 DONNA LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 BRIELLE COHEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 15 DONNA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6861

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COHEN BRIELLE

Defendants

15 DONNA LLC

ZILBERSTEIN AHRON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TURLINGTON ALAN S.

Defendant Attorneys

FELDMAN STEPHEN MARK

TANENBAUM WILLIAM CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/21/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/3/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/18/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/4/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

5/4/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

5/4/2020: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/17/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/24/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/13/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

10/26/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • Hearing02/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Hearing11/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Hearing11/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by 15 DONNA LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Association of Counsel); Filed by 15 DONNA LLC (Defendant); AHRON ZILBERSTEIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Stephen Mark Feldman (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by BRIELLE COHEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by 15 DONNA LLC (Defendant); AHRON ZILBERSTEIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by 15 DONNA LLC (Defendant); AHRON ZILBERSTEIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 15 DONNA LLC (Defendant); AHRON ZILBERSTEIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by BRIELLE COHEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BRIELLE COHEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BRIELLE COHEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BRIELLE COHEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TURLINGTON ALAN S.