This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2022 at 06:32:13 (UTC).

BRIDGET PAIGE-GATLING VS WALMART

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 BRIDGET PAIGE-GATLING filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1048

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAIGE-GATLING BRIDGET

Defendant

WALMART

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRELL MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

DAVIDSON DAVID

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/28/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/28/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/28/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Demand for Jury Trial

6/28/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/28/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Complaint

6/28/2022: Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial

7/28/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

7/28/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/28/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2024
  • Hearing06/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2023
  • Hearing12/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2023
  • Hearing12/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by WALMART (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by WALMART (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by WALMART (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by BRIDGET PAIGE-GATLING (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BRIDGET PAIGE-GATLING (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BRIDGET PAIGE-GATLING (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BRIDGET PAIGE-GATLING (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIDSON DAVID