This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2022 at 05:12:12 (UTC).

BRIANNA MAREESE JACOCKS, ET AL. VS ROBERT AARON WELLS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 BRIANNA MAREESE JACOCKS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBERT AARON WELLS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRIAN C. YEP, STEPHEN MORGAN, WENDY CHANG and MICHAEL C. KELLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0726

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRIAN C. YEP

STEPHEN MORGAN

WENDY CHANG

MICHAEL C. KELLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JACOCKS STANLEY

MCDONALD KYIRA RENEE

MCDONALD KRYSTOL RENEE

Defendants

FIELDTURF USA INC.

WELLS ROBERT AARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WILSON ERIC NATHAN

PARRIS KHAIL A.

Defendant Attorneys

HARRISON MATTHEW

SCHONBUCH MICHAEL NEIL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/28/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

1/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

9/14/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER PRECLUDING PLAINTIFFS' IMPROPERLY DESIGNATED EXPERT CHRISTOPHER FISCHER, M.D. AND A PROTECTIVE ORDER LIMITING PLAINTIFFS' NON-RETAINE

9/16/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER PRECLUDING PLAINTIFFS' IMPROPERLY DESIGNATED EXPERT CHRISTOPHER FISCHER, M.D. AND A PROTECTIVE ORDER LIMITING PLAINTIFFS' NON-RETAINE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER PRECLU...)

9/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER PRECLU...)

Notice of Settlement

9/17/2021: Notice of Settlement

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO EXCLUDE IMPROPER OPINION AND ULTIMATE CONCLUSIONS OF LAY WITNESS REGARDING ALLOCATION FOR FAULT

9/13/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO EXCLUDE IMPROPER OPINION AND ULTIMATE CONCLUSIONS OF LAY WITNESS REGARDING ALLOCATION FOR FAULT

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND AN ORDER REOPENING DISCOVERY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF OBTAINING THE DEPOSITIONS OF ROBERT WELLS AND

9/13/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND AN ORDER REOPENING DISCOVERY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF OBTAINING THE DEPOSITIONS OF ROBERT WELLS AND

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FIELD TURF USA, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS' GUARDIAN AD LITEM STANLEY JACOCKS' TO ANSWER DEPOSITION QUESTIONS; DECLARATION OF ERIC N.

9/13/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FIELD TURF USA, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS' GUARDIAN AD LITEM STANLEY JACOCKS' TO ANSWER DEPOSITION QUESTIONS; DECLARATION OF ERIC N.

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND AN ORDER REOPENING DISCOVERY; DECLARATION OF TRACEY L. STROMBERG

9/13/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND AN ORDER REOPENING DISCOVERY; DECLARATION OF TRACEY L. STROMBERG

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE INTRODUCTION OF CORONER AND AUTOPSY PHOTOGRAPHS OF DECEDENT

9/13/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE INTRODUCTION OF CORONER AND AUTOPSY PHOTOGRAPHS OF DECEDENT

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT BASED ON THE REPTILE THEORY AND SAFETY OF THE COMMUNITY

9/13/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT BASED ON THE REPTILE THEORY AND SAFETY OF THE COMMUNITY

Separate Statement

9/13/2021: Separate Statement

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE MEDICAL BILLS IN EXCESS OF AMOUNTS ACCEPTED AS FULL AND COMPLETE PAYMENT BY PLAINTIFFS' MEDICAL PROVIDERS

9/13/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE MEDICAL BILLS IN EXCESS OF AMOUNTS ACCEPTED AS FULL AND COMPLETE PAYMENT BY PLAINTIFFS' MEDICAL PROVIDERS

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO DEFENDANTS' LIABILITY INSURANCE

9/13/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO DEFENDANTS' LIABILITY INSURANCE

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT RETENTION OF MEDICAL AND DAMAGES EXPERTS

9/13/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT RETENTION OF MEDICAL AND DAMAGES EXPERTS

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR REFERENCE TO THE SIZE AND WEALTH OF THE PARTIES

9/13/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR REFERENCE TO THE SIZE AND WEALTH OF THE PARTIES

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO PRECLUDE ARGUMENT THAT DEFENDANT FAILED TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY

9/13/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO PRECLUDE ARGUMENT THAT DEFENDANT FAILED TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY

139 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • Hearing04/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Michael C. Kelley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Stephen Morgan, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Michael C. Kelley, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department A14, Stephen Morgan, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Michael C. Kelley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Michael C. Kelley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Michael C. Kelley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Deposition Responses from Plaintiffs? Guardian Ad Litem Stanley Jacocks) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
192 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by FIELDTURF USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brianna Mareese Jacocks (Plaintiff); Katie Francis Jacocks (Plaintiff); Gene Daveyon Bernie Jacocks (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brianna Mareese Jacocks (Plaintiff); Katie Francis Jacocks (Plaintiff); Gene Daveyon Bernie Jacocks (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Brianna Mareese Jacocks (Plaintiff); Katie Francis Jacocks (Plaintiff); Gene Daveyon Bernie Jacocks (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Brianna Mareese Jacocks (Plaintiff); Katie Francis Jacocks (Plaintiff); Gene Daveyon Bernie Jacocks (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Brianna Mareese Jacocks (Plaintiff); Katie Francis Jacocks (Plaintiff); Gene Daveyon Bernie Jacocks (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Brianna Mareese Jacocks (Plaintiff); Katie Francis Jacocks (Plaintiff); Gene Daveyon Bernie Jacocks (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brianna Mareese Jacocks (Plaintiff); Katie Francis Jacocks (Plaintiff); Gene Daveyon Bernie Jacocks (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brianna Mareese Jacocks (Plaintiff); Katie Francis Jacocks (Plaintiff); Gene Daveyon Bernie Jacocks (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIELDTURF USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRISON MATTHEW

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHONBUCH MICHAEL NEIL