This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/31/2021 at 17:06:05 (UTC).

BRIANNA COLETTE MCDONALD VS LOUISE NESSELSTEN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 BRIANNA COLETTE MCDONALD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LOUISE NESSELSTEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8139

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCDONALD BRIANNA COLETTE

Defendants

TAYLOR DEFORREST

NESSELSTEN LOUISE

EL-AMIN QADREE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNALD BRANDON C.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/13/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

6/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/29/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/25/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/25/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/1/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/1/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • Hearing01/06/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Brianna Colette McDonald (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Brianna Colette McDonald (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Brianna Colette McDonald (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Brianna Colette McDonald (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brianna Colette McDonald (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brianna Colette McDonald (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Brianna Colette McDonald (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brianna Colette McDonald (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brianna Colette McDonald (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brianna Colette McDonald (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERNALD BRANDON CLAUS